EP2502916 - ORGANIC DICARBOXYLIC ACIDS, SALTS AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Southeast University No. 2 Sipailou, Xuanwu Nanjing Jiangsu 210096 / CN | For all designated states Nanjing Medical University 140 Hanzhong Road Nanjing, Jiangsu 210029 / CN | For all designated states Zhejiang Shapuaisi Pharmacy Ltd. Lumianjin Qiao Chengbei Road Pinghu, Zhejiang 314200 / CN | [2012/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOU, Shaohua No. 2 Sipailou Xuanwu Nanjing Jiangsu 210096 / CN | 02 /
SHEN, Hong No. 2 Sipailou Xuanwu Nanjing Jiangsu 210096 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Yindi 140 Hanzhong Road Nanjing Jiangsu 210029 / CN | 04 /
SHEN, Jianping 140 Hanzhong Road Nanjing Jiangsu 210029 / CN | 05 /
ZHU, Yanqin 140 Hanzhong Road Nanjing Jiangsu 210029 / CN | 06 /
FENG, Luzhong 140 Hanzhong Road Nanjing Jiangsu 210029 / CN | 07 /
WU, Jianwei Lumianjin Qiao Chengbei Road Pinghu Zhejiang 314200 / CN | 08 /
CHEN, Dekang Lumianjin Qiao Chengbei Road Pinghu Zhejiang 314200 / CN | [2012/39] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 10829544.5 | 12.11.2010 | WO2010CN78691 | Priority number, date | CN200910212692 | 16.11.2009 Original published format: CN200910212692 | [2012/39] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011057580 | Date: | 19.05.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2502916 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2502916 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/56, A61K31/416, A61P27/12 | [2012/39] | CPC: |
C07D231/56 (EP,US);
A61P27/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ORGANISCHE DICARBOXYLSÄUREN, SALZE DAVON UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2012/39] | English: | ORGANIC DICARBOXYLIC ACIDS, SALTS AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF | [2012/39] | French: | ACIDES DICARBOXYLIQUES ORGANIQUES, LEURS SELS ET LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2012/39] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2012 | Translation filed | 04.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2012 | Search fee paid | 04.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/39] | 09.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 02.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.11.2010 | AL | 30.04.2014 | AT | 30.04.2014 | BE | 30.04.2014 | CY | 30.04.2014 | CZ | 30.04.2014 | DK | 30.04.2014 | EE | 30.04.2014 | ES | 30.04.2014 | FI | 30.04.2014 | HR | 30.04.2014 | IT | 30.04.2014 | LT | 30.04.2014 | LV | 30.04.2014 | MC | 30.04.2014 | MK | 30.04.2014 | MT | 30.04.2014 | NL | 30.04.2014 | PL | 30.04.2014 | RO | 30.04.2014 | RS | 30.04.2014 | SE | 30.04.2014 | SI | 30.04.2014 | SK | 30.04.2014 | SM | 30.04.2014 | TR | 30.04.2014 | BG | 30.07.2014 | NO | 30.07.2014 | GR | 31.07.2014 | IS | 30.08.2014 | PT | 01.09.2014 | IE | 12.11.2014 | LU | 12.11.2014 | CH | 30.11.2014 | LI | 30.11.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 12.11.2010 | |
AT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
MK | 30.04.2014 | ||
MT | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
SM | 30.04.2014 | ||
TR | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
IE | 12.11.2014 | ||
LU | 12.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 12.11.2010 | |
AT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
MT | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
SM | 30.04.2014 | ||
TR | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
IE | 12.11.2014 | ||
LU | 12.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 12.11.2010 | |
AT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
SM | 30.04.2014 | ||
TR | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
IE | 12.11.2014 | ||
LU | 12.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
SM | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
IE | 12.11.2014 | ||
LU | 12.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
IE | 12.11.2014 | ||
LU | 12.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
LU | 12.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
LU | 12.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
LU | 12.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
LU | 12.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 30.04.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0191520 (ACRAF [IT]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US5212159 (OHMORI SHINJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * claims 1-9 *; | [XP] - SHEN H ET AL, "Synthesis and biological evaluations of novel bendazac lysine analogues as potent anticataract agents", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, GB, vol. 20, no. 7, ISSN 0960-894X, (20100401), pages 2115 - 2118, (20100219), XP026971024 [XP] 1-5 * the whole document * | International search | [XP]CN101704785 (UNIV SOUTHEAST, et al); | [XP]CN101703503 (UNIV SOUTHEAST, et al); | [X] - LI YANGYAN ET AL., "Synthesis of Bendazac lysine", CHEMICAL INDUSTRY TIMES, (20060404), vol. 20, no. 4, pages 38 - 39, XP008157553 |