EP2500913 - CABLE, CABLE DUCT AND METHODS FOR MANUFACTURING CABLE AND CABLE DUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2012/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUKEGAWA Masamichi c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi, 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIMOTO, Hiroyuki c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi, 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2012/38] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/38] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10829924.9 | 09.11.2010 | WO2010JP69921 | Priority number, date | JP20090257271 | 10.11.2009 Original published format: JP 2009257271 | [2012/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011058965 | Date: | 19.05.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2500913 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01B7/17, H01B13/16, H01B17/58, H01B19/04, H01B7/28 | [2014/34] | CPC: |
H01B7/28 (EP,US);
H01B19/04 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1393 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/38] | H01B7/17, H01B13/16, H01B17/58 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/38] | Title | German: | KABEL, KABELFÜHRUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES KABELS UND DER KABELFÜHRUNG | [2012/38] | English: | CABLE, CABLE DUCT AND METHODS FOR MANUFACTURING CABLE AND CABLE DUCT | [2012/38] | French: | CÂBLE, GAINE DE CÂBLE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION | [2012/38] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2012 | Translation filed | 22.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/38] | 19.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/36] | 14.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO0017889 (RAYCHEM LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,9,10 * under heading: Examples of Wire Construction; page 9 - page 10 * * first two paragraphs; page 2 * * under heading: Methods of Fabricating; page 5 * [Y] 3,5,8,10 [I] 3,8; | [XY]WO0169610 (TYCO ELECTRONICS LTD UK [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,9 * under heading: Examples of Wire Construction; page 8 * [Y] 3,5,8,10; | [XY]US3650827 (BROWN CHESTER A, et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,9 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 47 - column 3, line 54 * [Y] 3,5,8,10; | [XY]DE3632883 (NERCESSIAN KEVORK [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,9 * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 37; figures 1,2 * [Y] 3,5,8,10; | [A]US5589028 (ROBINSON DONALD N [US], et al) [A] 3,5,8,10 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JPS61208707 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JPS63190210 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE, et al); | [A]JPH0581934 (SHOWA ELECTRIC WIRE & CABLE CO); | [X]JP2005038662 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) |