EP2499817 - IMAGE DISPLAY APPARATUS AND OPERATION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/38] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNG, Young Kook 16 Woomyun-dong Seocho-ku Seoul 137-724 / KR | [2012/38] | Representative(s) | Schicker, Silvia, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/38] | Schicker, Silvia, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10830152.4 | 10.11.2010 | WO2010KR07896 | Priority number, date | KR20090108710 | 11.11.2009 Original published format: KR 20090108710 | [2012/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011059220 | Date: | 19.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2499817 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.11.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445, H04N21/482, H04N21/422, H04N21/475 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
H04N21/4821 (EP,US);
H04N5/445 (KR);
H04N21/42204 (EP,US);
H04N21/4227 (KR);
H04N21/47 (KR);
H04N21/4755 (EP,US);
H04N21/482 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/38] | H04N5/445 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/38] | Title | German: | BILDANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2012/38] | English: | IMAGE DISPLAY APPARATUS AND OPERATION METHOD THEREFOR | [2012/38] | French: | APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGES ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2012/38] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2012 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/38] | 18.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/52] | 24.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.05.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1246465 (CANAL PLUS SA [FR]) [Y] 1-3,7-15 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraphs [0023] - [0027] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0126] * * paragraphs [0132] - [0135] * * paragraph [0139] * * figures 2-4, 8, 9 *; | [XY]US2006064716 (SULL SANGHOON [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,6,11-15 * paragraph [0251] * * paragraphs [0296] - [0298] * * paragraph [0303] * * paragraph [0329] * * figures 1A-1C, 6D * [Y] 1-5,7-15; | [Y]JP2006140732 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [Y] 4,5 * paragraphs [0012] - [0014] * * paragraphs [0046] - [0048] ** figures 1,5 *; | [XA]WO2009130810 (SHARP KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6,9,11-14 * abstract * [A] 3-5,10,15; | EP2293179 [ ] (SHARP KK [JP]) [ ] * page 3 * * paragraphs [0013] - [0014] * * paragraph [0033] * * Lines 1-18 of; paragraph [0036] * * paragraphs [0048] - [0050] * * paragraphs [0052] - [0053] * * paragraph [0057] * * claims 2,3 * * figures 4,6,21 * | International search | [A]JP2004356774 (SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT INC, et al); | [A]KR20060093511 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]KR20090077477 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |