Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
16.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] |
05.07.2015 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
09.01.2015 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
18.04.2014 | Change - representative | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
03.12.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.01.2013 | Change - extension states | published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
24.10.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.08.2012 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] |
17.08.2012 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] |
03.07.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.06.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant | |
30.05.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.05.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication |