|
22.02.2019 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2018 |
Information about intention to grant a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.03.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
173 |
|
13.03.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
173 |
|
22.02.2018 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
02.02.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.09.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
173 |
|
27.09.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
173 |
|
23.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
56 |
|
23.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.04.2017 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2017 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2017 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2017 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
31.03.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2017 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.2015 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2015 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.12.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2013 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2013 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2013 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.04.2013 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2012 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2012 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
06.06.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.03.2012 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.06.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
85 |
|
09.06.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
143 |
|
19.05.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2011 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
179 |