10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
03.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
19.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
19.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
12.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
22.02.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
16.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
16.03.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.04.2018 [2018/16] |
13.03.2018 |
New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent |
|
13.03.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
16.02.2018 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
16.02.2018 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
16.02.2018 |
Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.02.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.02.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.12.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.09.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.09.2017 |
Change - inventor |
|
27.06.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.04.2017 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.04.2017 |
Change - applicant |
published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] |
02.01.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.11.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.01.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.12.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.11.2015 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.07.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.07.2015 |
First examination report |
|
29.11.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.11.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.11.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
19.04.2013 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
19.04.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
19.04.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
18.01.2013 |
Change - extension states |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
28.11.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.08.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] |
17.08.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] |
23.07.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.07.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.07.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.05.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.05.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|