EP2498609 - SELECTIVE HETEROCYCLIC SPHINGOSINE 1 PHOSPHATE RECEPTOR MODULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celgene International II Sàrl Rue des Moulins 2108 Couvet / CH | [2017/19] |
Former [2012/38] | For all designated states Receptos, Inc. 10835 Road to the Cure, 205 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOEHM, Marcus, F. 2811 Maple Street San Diego, CA 92104 / US | 02 /
MARTINBOROUGH, Esther 11128 Portobelo Drive San Diego, CA 92124 / US | 03 /
BRAHMACHARY, Enugurthi 11795 Spruce Run Dr. No. C San Diego, CA 92131 / US | 04 /
MOORJANI, Manisha 8389 Reagan Glen San Diego, CA 92127 / US | 05 /
TAMIYA, Junko 258 Argus Way Oceanside, CA 92057 / US | 06 /
HUANG, Liming 12788 Adolphia Court San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 07 /
YEAGER, Adam, Richard 3468 Copley Avenue San Diego, CA 92116 / US | [2018/16] |
Former [2012/38] | 01 /
BOEHM, Marcus, F. 2811 Maple Street San Diego CA 92104 / US | ||
02 /
MARTINBOROUGH, Esther 11128 Portobelo Drive San Diego CA 92124 / US | |||
03 /
BRAHMACHARY, Enugurthi 11795 Spruce Run Dr. C San Diego CA 92131 / US | |||
04 /
MOORJANI, Manisha 8389 Reagan Glen San Diego CA 92127 / US | |||
05 /
TAMIYA, Junko 258 Argus Way Oceanside CA 92057 / US | |||
06 /
HUANG, Liming 12788 Adolphia Court San Diego CA 92129 / US | |||
07 /
YEAGER, Adam, Richard 3468 Copley Avenue San Diego CA 92116 / US | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2018/16] |
Former [2012/38] | Cohausz & Florack Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 10830879.2 | 15.11.2010 | [2018/16] | WO2010US56759 | Priority number, date | US20090262474P | 18.11.2009 Original published format: US 262474 P | US20090261295P | 13.11.2009 Original published format: US 261295 P | [2012/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011060391 | Date: | 19.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2498609 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2498609 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/78, A61K31/425 | [2012/38] | CPC: |
C07D417/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07D285/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07D277/30 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/433 (KR);
A61K45/06 (KR);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C209/62 (US);
C07C253/30 (US);
C07C269/04 (US);
C07C29/143 (US);
C07C313/06 (US);
C07D285/135 (EP,KR,US);
C07D333/24 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07D333/28 (EP,KR,US);
C07D333/38 (EP,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D417/10 (EP,CN,US);
C07F5/02 (KR,US);
C07F7/188 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELEKTIVE HETEROCYCLISCHE SPHINGOSIN-1-PHOSPHATREZEPTORMODULATOREN | [2012/38] | English: | SELECTIVE HETEROCYCLIC SPHINGOSINE 1 PHOSPHATE RECEPTOR MODULATORS | [2012/38] | French: | MODULATEURS DE RÉCEPTEUR DE SPHINGOSINE-1-PHOSPHATE HÉTÉROCYCLIQUES SÉLECTIFS | [2012/38] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2012 | Search fee paid | 06.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/38] | 20.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 13.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.11.2010 | AL | 18.04.2018 | AT | 18.04.2018 | CY | 18.04.2018 | CZ | 18.04.2018 | EE | 18.04.2018 | FI | 18.04.2018 | HR | 18.04.2018 | LT | 18.04.2018 | LV | 18.04.2018 | MC | 18.04.2018 | MK | 18.04.2018 | PL | 18.04.2018 | RO | 18.04.2018 | RS | 18.04.2018 | SI | 18.04.2018 | SK | 18.04.2018 | SM | 18.04.2018 | TR | 18.04.2018 | BG | 18.07.2018 | NO | 18.07.2018 | IS | 18.08.2018 | LU | 15.11.2018 | MT | 15.11.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 15.11.2010 | |
AL | 18.04.2018 | ||
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CY | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
MK | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
LU | 15.11.2018 | ||
MT | 15.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 15.11.2010 | |
AL | 18.04.2018 | ||
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
LU | 15.11.2018 | ||
MT | 15.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
LU | 15.11.2018 | ||
MT | 15.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
LU | 15.11.2018 | ||
MT | 15.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
LU | 15.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2004058149 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15* claim 1 * | International search | [Y]US6511975 (NISHI TAKAHIDE [JP], et al); | [Y]US2006161005 (DOHERTY GEORGE A [US], et al); | [Y]US2008009534 (CHENG PETER T [US], et al); | [Y]US2008249093 (COLANDREA VINCENT J [US], et al) | by applicant | - LIT et al., "Salt Selection for Basic Drugs", IntJ. Pharm., (19860000), vol. 33, pages 201 - 217 |