EP2504331 - COMPOUND, CERTAIN NOVEL FORMS THEREOF, PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS THEREOF AND METHODS FOR PREPARATION AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hutchison Medipharma Limited 720 Cai Lun Road Building 4 Pudong, Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2012/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SU, Wei-Guo 720 Cai Lun Road Building 4 Pudong Shanghai 201203 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Weihan 720 Cai Lun Road Building 4 Pudong Shanghai 201203 / CN | 03 /
JIA, Hong 720 Cai Lun Road Building 4 Pudong Shanghai 201203 / CN | 04 /
CUI, Yumin 720 Cai Lun Road Building 4 Pudong Shanghai 201203 / CN | 05 /
REN, Yongxin 720 Cai Lun Road Building 4 Pudong Shanghai 201203 / CN | 06 /
SAI, Yang 720 Cai Lun Road Building 4 Pudong Shanghai 201203 / CN | 07 /
WU, Zhenping 720 Cai Lun Road Building 4 Pudong Shanghai 201203 / CN | 08 /
LI, Wenji 720 Cai Lun Road Building 4 Pudong Shanghai 201203 / CN | 09 /
SHAO, Jiangyong 720 Cai Lun Road Building 4 Pudong Shanghai 201203 / CN | 10 /
TIAN, Zhenping 720 Cai Lun Road Building 4 Pudong Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2012/40] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/46] | Howard, Paul Nicholas Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2012/40] | Howard, Paul Nicholas Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10831161.4 | 23.11.2010 | WO2010CN78997 | Priority number, date | CN200910199259 | 23.11.2009 Original published format: CN200910199259 | [2012/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011060746 | Date: | 26.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2504331 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2504331 | Date: | 12.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/12, A61K31/506, A61P9/00, A61P35/00 | [2012/40] | CPC: |
C07D403/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/506 (KR,US);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNG, BESTIMMTE NEUE FORMEN DAVON, PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DARAUS SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2012/40] | English: | COMPOUND, CERTAIN NOVEL FORMS THEREOF, PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS THEREOF AND METHODS FOR PREPARATION AND USE | [2012/40] | French: | COMPOSÉ, CERTAINES NOUVELLES FORMES DE CELUI-CI, COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES DE CELUI-CI ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2012/40] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2012 | Search fee paid | 15.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/40] | 14.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.2015
ADMISSIBLE Generics [UK] Limited (trading as Mylan) Building 4 Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB Opponent's representative O'Connell, Maura, et al, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.2015
ADMISSIBLE Generics [UK] Limited (trading as Mylan) Building 4 Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB Opponent's representative O'Connell, Maura, et al, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | 18.09.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.12.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.10.2016 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2017/11] | 14.10.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.10.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 31.10.2016 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.11.2010 | AL | 12.11.2014 | CY | 12.11.2014 | EE | 12.11.2014 | HR | 12.11.2014 | LT | 12.11.2014 | LV | 12.11.2014 | MC | 12.11.2014 | MK | 12.11.2014 | MT | 12.11.2014 | RO | 12.11.2014 | RS | 12.11.2014 | SI | 12.11.2014 | SK | 12.11.2014 | SM | 12.11.2014 | LU | 23.11.2014 | IS | 12.03.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 23.11.2010 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
MK | 12.11.2014 | ||
MT | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
SM | 12.11.2014 | ||
LU | 23.11.2014 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 23.11.2010 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
MT | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
SM | 12.11.2014 | ||
LU | 23.11.2014 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 23.11.2010 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
SM | 12.11.2014 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 12.11.2014 | |
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
SM | 12.11.2014 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 12.11.2014 | |
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | CY | 12.11.2014 | |
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 12.11.2014 | |
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 12.11.2014 | |
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 12.11.2014 | |
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 12.11.2014 | |
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 12.11.2014 | |
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | HR | 12.11.2014 | |
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | LT | 12.11.2014 | |
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 12.11.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008128231 (HUTCHISON MEDIPHARMA ENTPR LTD [BS], et al) [A] 1-24* the whole document *; | [AP]WO2010025138 (HUTCHISON MEDIPHARMA ENTPR LTD [BS], et al) [AP] 1-24 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2008255172 (SU WEI-GUO [CN], et al); | [A]CN101289444 (HUTCHISON MEDIPHARMA SHANGHAI [CN]) |