EP2502963 - DISPERSION COMPOSITION, PHOTOSENSITIVE RESIN COMPOSITION, AND SOLID-STATE IMAGE PICKUP ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARUYAMA, Yoichi c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka 421-0396 / JP | 02 /
NAGATA, Yuzo c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka 421-0396 / JP | 03 /
EINAGA, Hiroyuki c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka 421-0396 / JP | 04 /
KANNA, Shinichi c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka 421-0396 / JP | [2012/39] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10831592.0 | 17.11.2010 | WO2010JP70502 | Priority number, date | JP20090265605 | 20.11.2009 Original published format: JP 2009265605 | JP20100253806 | 12.11.2010 Original published format: JP 2010253806 | [2012/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011062198 | Date: | 26.05.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2502963 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08L55/00, B01F17/52, C08F2/44, C08F2/50, C08F290/06, C08K3/22, G02B1/04, G02B3/00, G02B5/20, G03F7/004, G03F7/031 | [2012/39] | CPC: |
G02B1/04 (EP,KR,US);
C09K23/002 (EP,KR,US);
C08F290/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/22 (EP,KR,US);
C08L33/14 (KR);
C09K23/34 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0007 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0045 (KR);
G03F7/028 (KR);
G03F7/031 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/033 (EP,KR,US);
C08K2003/2241 (EP,US);
G02B3/0012 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/22, C08L33/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/39] | Title | German: | DISPERSIONSZUSAMMENSETZUNG, LICHTEMPFINDLICHE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND FESTKÖRPERBILDAUFNAHMEELEMENT | [2012/39] | English: | DISPERSION COMPOSITION, PHOTOSENSITIVE RESIN COMPOSITION, AND SOLID-STATE IMAGE PICKUP ELEMENT | [2012/39] | French: | COMPOSITION DE DISPERSION, COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE PHOTOSENSIBLE, ET ÉLÉMENT DE COLLECTE D'IMAGE À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2012/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2012 | Translation filed | 19.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2012 | Search fee paid | 19.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/39] | 23.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/09] | 10.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2004162016 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1-15* no GRAFT copolymer;; example - *; | [X] - A. N. OZERIN ET AL, "Hybrid nanocomposites based on graft copolymer of chitosan with poly(vinyl alcohol) and titanium oxide", NANOTECHNOLOGIES IN RUSSIA, (20090601), vol. 4, no. 5-6, doi:10.1134/S1995078009050103, ISSN 1995-0780, pages 331 - 339, XP055204644 [X] 1,5 * abstract * * TiO2 particle size: diameter ~22nm; page 338, column left, paragraph 2nd * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1134/S1995078009050103 | [X] - A. N. OZERIN ET AL, "Nanocomposites based on modified chitosan and titanium oxide", POLYMER SCIENCE SERIES A, (20060601), vol. 48, no. 6, doi:10.1134/S0965545X06060137, ISSN 0965-545X, pages 638 - 643, XP055204671 [X] 1,5 * size of TiO2 particles; page 641, column right, paragraph 2nd * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1134/S0965545X06060137 | International search | [A]JP2004287409 (JSR CORP); | [X]JP2008046268 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [A]WO2009054437 (KAO CORP [JP], et al); | [X]JP2009096977 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [X]WO2009116442 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP], et al); | [AP]WO2010098327 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP], et al) | by applicant | US3615455 | JPS4643946B | JPS4864183 | JPS4841708B | JPS4842965B | JPS4943191B | GB1388492 | JPS5137193 | JPS5182102 | JPS5147334B | JPS5230490B | JPS52134692 | JPS53702 | JPS53128333 | JPS53133428 | JPS5492723 | JPS5421726B | JPS5425957B | JPS5434327B | US4212976 | JPS5534414B | JPS55500806 | JPS5617654B | JPS5675643 | JPS571819B | JPS576096B | JPS57196231 | JPS5812577B | JPS5849860B | JPS595240 | JPS595241 | JPS5944615 | JPS5953836 | JPS5971048 | JPS59138205 | DE3337024 | JPS6084305 | JPS6122048 | JPS61169831 | JPS6218537 | JPS6258241 | JPS6239417B | JPS6239418B | JPS6353543 | JPS6353544 | JPS6356651 | JPS63260909 | JPS63277653 | JPS63287944 | JPS63287947 | JPS6433104 | JPH01105238 | JPH01165613 | JPH0140337B | JPH0140336B | JPH01271741 | JPH0225493 | JPH0216765B | JPH0232293B | JPH02226149 | JPH0519475 | JPH0534920 | JPH05142772 | JPH05281728 | JPH06308727 | JPH0712004B | JPH07271028 | JPH07120041B | JPH07120042B | JPH0812424B | JPH10291969 | JP2000066385 | JP2000080068 | EP0993966 | JP2000187322 | JP2001233842 | JP2001242612 | JP2001318463 | JP2002062698 | JP2002107918 | EP1204000 | JP2002309057 | JP2002363206 | JP2002363207 | JP2002363208 | JP2002363209 | JP2003311569 | JP2004534797 | JP2006342166 | JP2007231000 | JP2007269779 | JP2007322744 | JP2008185683 | JP4142973B | JP4225898B | JP2009519904 | US7556910 | JP2009179678 | JP2009191179 | JP2009191061 | JP2009221114 | WO2009123109 | JP2009242469 | WO2009131189 | US2009292039 | US7626957 | JP2010015025 | JP2010032985 | JP4420189B | JP4429620B | JP2010185072 | - JOURNAL OF THE ADHESION SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (1984), vol. 20, no. 7, pages 300 - 308 | - WAKABAYASHI, BULL. CHEM. SOC. JAPAN, (1969), vol. 42, page 2924 | - F. C. SCHAEFER, J. ORG. CHEM., (1964), vol. 29, page 1527 | - J. C. S. PERKIN, (1979), vol. II, pages 1653 - 1660 | - J. C. S. PERKIN, (1979), vol. II, pages 156 - 162 | - JOURNAL OF PHOTOPOLYMER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (1995), pages 202 - 232 | - JOURNAL OF POLYMER SOCIETY, vol. 10, page 3173 | - Kagaku no Ryoiki, NANKODO, (1979), vol. 122, pages 96 - 103 | - CHEMICAL REVIEWS, (1991), vol. 91, pages 165 - 195 |