10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
05.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
07.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
03.08.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] |
27.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
01.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
25.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
11.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
04.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
09.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
16.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
19.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
12.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] |
25.08.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
25.08.2017 |
Change - applicant |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
22.08.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
15.08.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.08.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
17.05.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.01.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.11.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.09.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.06.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.02.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.01.2016 |
First examination report |
|
30.11.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.10.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.03.2015 |
Change - date of supplementary search report |
published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] |
27.02.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] |
27.02.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] |
20.02.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] |
20.02.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] |
28.11.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.11.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.02.2013 |
Change - extension states |
published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] |
16.11.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.08.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] |
31.08.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] |
09.07.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.06.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.06.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.06.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.06.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
15.06.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.06.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|