EP2508862 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR INSPECTING POOR SEALING OF CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIWA CAN COMPANY 2-1-10, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8240 / JP | [2012/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IJUIN, Taichi c/o Central Laboratory of DAIWA CAN COMPANY 5-1 Nishihashimoto 5-chome Midori-ku Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa 229-1183 / JP | 02 /
YAMAUCHI, Tomio c/o Central Laboratory of DAIWA CAN COMPANY 5-1 Nishihashimoto 5-chome Midori-ku Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa 229-1183 / JP | 03 /
KAWAZOE, Akira c/o Technical Center of DAIWA CAN COMPANY 5-1 Nishihashimoto 5-chome Midori-ku Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa 229-1183 / JP | 04 /
TAKATOMI, Tetsuya c/o Central Laboratory of DAIWA CAN COMPANY 5-1 Nishihashimoto 5-chome Midori-ku Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa 229-1183 / JP | [2012/41] | Representative(s) | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Hepworth Browne 15 St Paul's Street Leeds LS1 2JG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/41] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Hepworth Browne Pearl Chambers 22 South Parade Leeds, Yorkshire LS1 5BY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10834540.6 | 30.11.2010 | WO2010JP71307 | Priority number, date | JP20090276347 | 04.12.2009 Original published format: JP 2009276347 | [2012/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011068090 | Date: | 09.06.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2508862 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.06.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01M3/38, B65B57/00, B65B57/02, G01N21/90 | [2012/41] | CPC: |
G01N21/35 (EP,US);
G01M3/38 (EP,US);
G01N21/9054 (EP,US);
G01N21/9081 (EP,US);
G01N21/3563 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR INSPEKTION SCHLECHTER VERSIEGELUNG EINES BEHÄLTERS | [2012/41] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR INSPECTING POOR SEALING OF CONTAINER | [2012/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR INSPECTER UN DÉFAUT D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ D'UN RÉCIPIENT | [2012/41] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2012 | Translation filed | 01.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2012 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/41] | 14.12.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH11160185 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] *; | [Y]US2002097396 (SCHAFER THOMAS C [US]) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0030] - [0035] *; | [Y]JP2002214361 (KOITO KOGYO KK) [Y] 1-6 * abstract ** paragraph [0039] *; | [Y]JP2007071568 (MORINAGA MILK INDUSTRY CO LTD) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] - [0018] * | International search | [A]JPS62276444 (NICHIZO TEC KK, et al); | [A]JPH0996581 (SHIMADZU CORP); | [Y]JPH11160185 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP); | [A]JP2000249663 (KAO CORP); | [Y]JP2002214361 (KOITO KOGYO KK); | [Y]JP2007071568 (MORINAGA MILK INDUSTRY CO LTD) | by applicant | JPH06144416 | JP2000079917 |