EP2510541 - NONVOLATILE LATCH CIRCUIT AND LOGIC CIRCUIT, AND SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0036 / JP | [2020/20] |
Former [2012/42] | For all designated states Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co. Ltd. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0036 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Kiyoshi c/o Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0036 / JP | 02 /
KOYAMA, Jun c/o Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | [2012/42] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/42] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10835827.6 | 16.11.2010 | WO2010JP70753 | Priority number, date | JP20090282139 | 11.12.2009 Original published format: JP 2009282139 | [2012/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011070905 | Date: | 16.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2510541 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.06.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/8242, H01L21/8234, H01L27/08, H01L27/088, H01L27/10, H01L27/108, H01L29/786, G11C14/00, G11C11/24, H01L27/06, H01L27/105, H01L27/12, H01L29/04, H03K3/037, H03K19/173 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
G11C14/0054 (EP,KR,US);
G11C11/24 (KR,US);
H03K3/037 (KR,US);
H01L27/0688 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/1207 (KR,US);
H01L27/1225 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/1255 (KR,US);
H01L29/045 (KR,US);
H01L29/7869 (KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/42] | H01L21/8242, H01L21/8234, H01L27/08, H01L27/088, H01L27/10, H01L27/108, H01L29/786 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/42] | Title | German: | NICHTFLÜCHTIGE SPERRSCHALTUNG UND LOGIKSCHALTUNG SOWIE HALBLEITERVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2012/42] | English: | NONVOLATILE LATCH CIRCUIT AND LOGIC CIRCUIT, AND SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE USING THE SAME | [2012/42] | French: | CIRCUIT À VERROUILLAGE NON VOLATIL, CIRCUIT LOGIQUE ET DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR UTILISANT CELUI-CI | [2012/42] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2012 | Search fee paid | 11.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/42] | 26.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/44] | 23.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.09.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH05110392 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]WO2009063542 (FUJITSU MICROELECTRONICS LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]US2009152506 (UMEDA KENICHI [JP], et al); | [P]US2010213998 (UEMURA TAIKI [JP], et al); | International search | [Y]JPS6466899 (RAMTRON CORP); | [Y]JPH05110392 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JPH07147530 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JP2006165532 (CANON KK, et al); | [AP]JP2010034710 (NEC ELECTRONICS CORP) | by applicant | JPH0510392B | WO03044953 | WO2009063542 | US2009152506 | WO2011062075 |