EP2510951 - MOLECULAR PROBE FOR IMAGING OF PANCREATIC ISLET, AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyoto University 36-1, Yoshida-honmachi Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | For all designated states ARKRAY, Inc. 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | [2015/33] |
Former [2012/42] | For all designated states Kyoto University 36-1, Yoshida-honmachi Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | ||
For all designated states Arkray, Inc. 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAJI, Hideo c/o Graduate School of Pharmaceutical Sciences Kyoto University 46-29, Yoshida-shimoadachi-cho Sakyo-ku Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | 02 /
INAGAKI, Nobuya c/o Graduate School of Medicine Kyoto University Yoshida-konoecho Sakyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | 03 /
TOYODA, Kentaro c/o Graduate School of Medicine Kyoto University Yoshida-konoecho Sakyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | 04 /
KIMURA, Hiroyuki c/o Graduate School of Pharmaceutical Sciences Kyoto University 46-29, Yoshida-shimoadachi-cho Sakyo-ku Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | 05 /
HIRAO, Konomu c/o ARKRAY, Inc. 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | 06 /
NAGAKAWA, Kenji c/o ARKRAY, Inc. 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | 07 /
MATSUDA, Hirokazu c/o ARKRAY, Inc. 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | [2016/27] |
Former [2012/42] | 01 /
SAJI Hideo c/o Graduate School of Pharmaceutical Sciences Kyoto University 46-29, Yoshida-shimoadachi-sho Sakyo-ku Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | ||
02 /
INAGAKI Nobuya c/o Graduate School of Medicine Kyoto University Yoshida-konoecho Sakyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | |||
03 /
TOYODA Kentaro c/o Graduate School of Medicine Kyoto University Yoshida-konoecho Sakyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | |||
04 /
KIMURA Hiroyuki c/o Graduate School of Pharmaceutical Sciences Kyoto University 46-29, Yoshida-shimoadachi-sho Sakyo-ku Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | |||
05 /
HIRAO Konomu 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | |||
06 /
NAGAKAWA Kenji 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | |||
07 /
MATSUDA Hirokazu 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | Representative(s) | Jones, Elizabeth Louise Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2016/28] |
Former [2012/42] | Jones, Elizabeth Louise Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10836003.3 | 08.12.2010 | [2016/28] | WO2010JP72041 | Priority number, date | JP20090280396 | 10.12.2009 Original published format: JP 2009280396 | US20090285293P | 10.12.2009 Original published format: US 285293 P | JP20100125983 | 01.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010125983 | US20100350732P | 02.06.2010 Original published format: US 350732 P | US20100388948P | 01.10.2010 Original published format: US 388948 P | [2012/50] |
Former [2012/42] | JP20090280396 | 10.12.2009 | |
US20090285293 | 10.12.2009 | ||
JP20100125983 | 01.06.2010 | ||
US20100350732 | 02.06.2010 | ||
US20100388948 | 01.10.2010 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011071083 | Date: | 16.06.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2510951 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2510951 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | [2014/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2510951 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.06.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K51/08, G01N33/74, C07K1/13, C07K14/605, G01T1/161 | [2013/20] | CPC: |
G01N33/74 (EP,US);
A61K51/00 (KR);
A61K49/06 (KR);
A61K51/088 (EP,US);
C07K1/13 (KR);
C07K14/605 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/42] | A61K51/00, C07K1/13, C07K14/605, G01N33/60, G01T1/161 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOLEKULARE SONDE ZUR BILDGEBUNG DER LANGERHANS-INSELN UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2012/42] | English: | MOLECULAR PROBE FOR IMAGING OF PANCREATIC ISLET, AND USE THEREOF | [2012/42] | French: | SONDE MOLÉCULAIRE POUR L'IMAGERIE D'ÎLOTS PANCRÉATIQUES, ET UTILISATION DE CELLE-CI | [2012/42] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2012 | Translation filed | 10.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/42] | 18.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 02.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.12.2010 | AL | 13.07.2016 | AT | 13.07.2016 | BE | 13.07.2016 | CY | 13.07.2016 | CZ | 13.07.2016 | DK | 13.07.2016 | EE | 13.07.2016 | ES | 13.07.2016 | FI | 13.07.2016 | HR | 13.07.2016 | IT | 13.07.2016 | LT | 13.07.2016 | LV | 13.07.2016 | MC | 13.07.2016 | MK | 13.07.2016 | NL | 13.07.2016 | PL | 13.07.2016 | RO | 13.07.2016 | RS | 13.07.2016 | SE | 13.07.2016 | SI | 13.07.2016 | SK | 13.07.2016 | SM | 13.07.2016 | TR | 13.07.2016 | BG | 13.10.2016 | NO | 13.10.2016 | GR | 14.10.2016 | IS | 13.11.2016 | PT | 14.11.2016 | IE | 08.12.2016 | LU | 08.12.2016 | MT | 08.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/43] | HU | 08.12.2010 | |
AT | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
MK | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
TR | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
IE | 08.12.2016 | ||
LU | 08.12.2016 | ||
MT | 08.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 08.12.2010 | |
AT | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
MK | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
TR | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
IE | 08.12.2016 | ||
LU | 08.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 08.12.2010 | |
AT | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
MK | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
IE | 08.12.2016 | ||
LU | 08.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
IE | 08.12.2016 | ||
LU | 08.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 13.07.2016 | |
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 13.07.2016 | |
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 13.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP2418216 (UNIV KYOTO [JP], et al) [E] 1-15 * claims 1-19 * * examples 1, 2 * | [X] - KIMURA H ET AL, "Development of in vivo imaging agents targeting glucagon-like peptide- 1 receptor (GLP-1R) in pancreatic islets", JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, SOCIETY OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, RESTON, VA, US, (20090501), vol. 50, no. SUP.2, ISSN 0161-5505, page 326, XP002683017 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | [X] - AL-SABAH SULEIMAN ET AL, "A model for receptor-peptide binding at the glucagon-like peptide-1 (GLP-1) receptor through the analysis of truncated ligands and receptors", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, BASINGSTOKE, HANTS; GB, (20030901), vol. 140, no. 2, doi:10.1038/SJ.BJP.0705453, ISSN 0007-1188, pages 339 - 346, XP002437826 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.bjp.0705453 | International search | [Y]JP2006503097 (MOLECULAR INSIGHT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.) | by applicant | JP2008511557 | - H. KIMURA ET AL., "Development of in vivo imaging agents targeting a glucagon-like peptide-1 receptor (GLP-1R) in pancreatic islets", SNM ANNUAL MEETING, (2009), no. 326 | - M. GOTTHARDT ET AL., "A new technique for in vivo imaging of specific GLP-1 binding sites", FIRST RESULTS IN SMALL RODENTS, REGULATORY PEPTIDES, (2006), vol. 137, pages 162 - 267 | - M. BECHE ET AL., "Are radiolabeled GLP-1 receptor antagonists useful for scintigraphy?", SNM ANNUAL MEETING, (2009), no. 327 | - "Seikagaku Jikken Koza", Protein IV, TOKYO KAGAKU DOJIN, (1977), vol. 1, pages 207 - 495 | - "Shin-Seikagaku Jikken Koza", Protein IV, TOKYO KAGAKU DOJIN, (1992), vol. 1, pages 3 - 74 |