EP2510045 - PROCESS FOR PREPARATION OF FLUOROSILICON POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/42] | For all designated states E.I. Du Pont De Nemours And Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US | ||
For all designated states Le Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3 Rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUNG, Ming-Hong 601 Andover Road Wilmington, Delaware 19803 / US | 02 /
AMEDURI, Bruno 26 Rue Louis Roumieux F-34090 Montpellier / FR | [2012/42] | Representative(s) | Heinemann, Monica, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Heinemann, Monica, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/42] | Heinemann, Monica, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte Hörselbergstrasse 5 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10836370.6 | 20.10.2010 | WO2010US53319 | Priority number, date | US20090632982 | 08.12.2009 Original published format: US 632982 | [2012/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011071599 | Date: | 16.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2510045 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/24, C08F14/18, C08F283/12, C08F214/22 | [2013/20] | CPC: |
C08F214/18 (EP,US);
C08G77/24 (KR);
C08F14/18 (KR);
C08F214/184 (EP,US);
C08F214/22 (EP,US);
C08F214/222 (EP,US);
C08F216/1408 (EP,US);
C08F283/12 (KR);
C08F8/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F8/42, C08F214/18 (US,EP);
C08F8/42, C08F214/184 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2012/42] | C08G77/24, C08F14/18, C08F283/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FLUORSILICIUMPOLYMERS | [2012/42] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARATION OF FLUOROSILICON POLYMER | [2012/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN POLYMÈRE DE FLUOROSILICONE | [2012/42] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2012 | Search fee paid | 21.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/42] | 14.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/01] | 17.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5077362 (WATANABE JUNICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]US5003008 (KOBAYASHI NOBUO [JP]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]EP1783146 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]US2009105435 (HUNG MING-HONG [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2008154004 (USCHOLD RONALD EARL [US], et al); | [A]US2002045782 (HUNG MING-HONG [US], et al); | [A]US2009023863 (KANEGA JUN [JP], et al); | [A]US2009105435 (HUNG MING-HONG [US], et al); | [A]US5041588 (CAPORICCIO GERARDO [US]); | [A]US5256745 (GROOTAERT WERNER M [US]) |