EP2509751 - ABRASIVE ARTICLE FOR USE WITH A GRINDING WHEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. One New Bond Street Worcester, MA 01615-0138 / US | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Abrasifs Rue de l'Ambassadeur 78700 Conflans-Sainte-Honorine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/42] | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. One New Bond Street Worcester, MA 01615-0138 / US | ||
For all designated states Saint-Gobain Abrasifs Rue de L'Ambassadeur 78700 Conflans-Sainte-Honorine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMANATH, Srinivasan 28 Avery Road Holden Massachusetts 01520 / US | 02 /
VEDANTHAM, Ramanujam 15 Arrowsic Street Worcester Massachusetts 01606 / US | [2012/42] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/42] | Zimmermann & Partner Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10836811.9 | 13.12.2010 | WO2010US60119 | Priority number, date | US20090285744P | 11.12.2009 Original published format: US 285744 P | [2012/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011072298 | Date: | 16.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2509751 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.10.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B24D11/00, B24D5/00, B24D11/06, B24D18/00, B24B1/00 | [2012/42] | CPC: |
B24D7/06 (EP,US);
B24D11/00 (KR);
B24B1/00 (KR);
B24D18/00 (KR);
B24D5/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/42] | Title | German: | SCHLEIFARTIKEL ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT EINEM SCHLEIFRAD | [2012/42] | English: | ABRASIVE ARTICLE FOR USE WITH A GRINDING WHEEL | [2012/42] | French: | ARTICLE ABRASIF À UTILISER AVEC UNE ROUE DE MEULAGE | [2012/42] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 02.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/42] | 25.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/20] | 02.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.05.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2001096467 (NIPPEI TOYAMA CORP) [X] 1-5,12 * paragraphs [0019] , [0034] , [0035]; figure 5 *[I] 6-11,13-15 | International search | [X]JPH01164564 (NORITAKE DIA KK); | [A]US2004110453 (BARNETT HERB [US]); | [A]US2009305619 (SCHMIED VADIM [DE], et al) | by applicant | JP2001096467 |