EP2513299 - DECELLULARIZED ADIPOSE TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY AT KINGSTON Kingston, Ontario K7L 3N6 / CA | [2012/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLYNN, Lauren E. 125 Carruthers Avenue Apartment 2 Kingston Ontario K7L 1M6 / CA | [2012/43] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/01] | Murphy, Colm Damien, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2012/43] | Murphy, Colm Damien, et al Ipulse (IP) Ltd. Carrington House 123-130-Regent Street London W1B 5SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 10836896.0 | 17.12.2010 | WO2010CA02010 | Priority number, date | US20090287236P | 17.12.2009 Original published format: US 287236 P | [2012/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011072393 | Date: | 23.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2513299 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 23.06.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/077, A61K35/12, A61K47/46, A61K8/98, A61L15/40, A61L27/36, A61P7/04, C09D189/04, C12N5/071, C07K14/78 | [2013/50] | CPC: |
A61L27/3604 (EP,KR,US);
A61L27/3683 (EP,KR,US);
A61L27/3834 (US);
A61L27/50 (US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P41/00 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
C12N11/02 (EP,KR,US);
C12N5/0653 (EP,KR,US);
A61L2300/64 (KR,US);
A61L2400/04 (KR,US);
A61L2400/06 (KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/43] | C12N5/077, A61K35/12, A61K47/46, A61K8/98, A61L15/40, A61L27/36, A61P7/04, C09D189/04, C12N5/071, C12S3/16, C07K14/78 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Title | German: | DEZELLULARISIERTES ADIPÖSES GEWEBE | [2012/43] | English: | DECELLULARIZED ADIPOSE TISSUE | [2012/43] | French: | TISSU ADIPEUX DÉCELLULARISÉ | [2012/43] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 05.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 10.07.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 09.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/02] | 23.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.03.2015 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.01.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 17.01.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.02.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.12.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 21.12.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.01.2016 | Decision despatched | Loss of rights: Claims | 13.09.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 13.09.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.09.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2009102452 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US], et al) [X] 4-9,14 * examples 1-6 * [I] 11,13; | [X]WO03022988 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [X] 4-9 * example 6 * * page 35 * * page 37, line 1 - line 5 *; | [E]WO2011019822 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US], et al) [E] 4-9,14 * examples 2,3 *; | [E]WO2012002986 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [E] 4-16 * the whole document *; | [XP] - L.E. FLYNN, "The use of decellularized adipose tissue to provide an inductive microenvironment for the adipogenic differentiation of human adipose-derived stem cells", BIOMATERIALS, (20100601), vol. 31, no. 17, doi:10.1016/j.biomaterials.2010.02.046, ISSN 0142-9612, pages 4715 - 4724, XP055084486 [XP] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2010.02.046 | International search | [X]US6777231 (KATZ ADAM J [US], et al); | [X]US2002119437 (GROOMS JAMIE M [US], et al); | [X]WO2008154149 (ZIMMER ORTHOBIOLOGICS INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2006095342 (TECHNION RES & DEV FOUNDATION [IL], et al) | [X] - GILBERT, T. W. ET AL., "Decellularization of tissues and organs.", BIOMATERIALS, (20060307), vol. 27, pages 3675 - 3683, XP027950962 | [XP] - FLYNN, L.E., "The use of decellularized adipose tissue to provide an inductive microenvironment for the adipogenic differentiation of human adipose-derived stem cells.", BIOMATERIALS, (20100320), vol. 31, pages 4715 - 4724 | by applicant | WO2009102452 | WO03022988 |