EP2512767 - CASTING BELT FOR PRODUCING TRANSCENDENTAL WIDE WIDTH FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SK Innovation Co., Ltd. 99, Seorin-dong Jongro-gu Seoul 110-110 / KR | [2016/04] |
Former [2012/43] | For all designated states SK Innovation Co., Ltd. 99, Seorin-dong Jongro-gu Seoul 110-110 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Hyuk Jun 208-302, Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-761 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Ki Yup 106-1305, Junggye Green Apt. Junggye 2-dong Nowon-gu Seoul 139-785 / KR | 03 /
SON, Sung Ho SK R Center dormitory Wonchon-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-370 / KR | 04 /
CHO, Yong Gyun 103-1206, Lucky Hana Apt. Sinseong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-721 / KR | 05 /
LEE, Chol Ho 119-501, Hyangchon Apt. Dunsan-dong Seo-gu Daejeon 302-120 / KR | 06 /
HWANG, Yoo Seock 209-1107, Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-761 / KR | [2012/43] | Representative(s) | Bassil, Nicholas Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/04] | Bassil, Nicholas Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2012/43] | Bassil, Nicholas Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10837786.2 | 16.11.2010 | [2016/04] | WO2010KR08090 | Priority number, date | KR20090123684 | 14.12.2009 Original published format: KR 20090123684 | [2012/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011074789 | Date: | 23.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2512767 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2512767 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.11.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B29C41/28, B29C41/38, B23K26/26, B29C65/16, G02F1/13, // B29L31/00, B29C33/38, B29C65/00 | [2014/29] | CPC: |
B29C41/28 (EP,KR,US);
B29C41/24 (KR);
B23K26/26 (EP,US);
B29C41/38 (EP,US);
B29C65/16 (EP,US);
B29C66/1142 (EP,US);
B29C66/1162 (EP,US);
B29C66/432 (EP,US);
B29C66/4322 (EP,US);
B29C66/4324 (EP,US);
B29C66/4329 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/73366 (EP,US);
G02F1/1303 (EP,US);
B29C33/3842 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2001/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/43] | B29C41/28, B29C41/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GUSSRIEMEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SCHICHT MIT TRANSZENDENTALER BREITE | [2012/43] | English: | CASTING BELT FOR PRODUCING TRANSCENDENTAL WIDE WIDTH FILM | [2012/43] | French: | RUBAN DE COULÉE POUR PRODUIRE UN FILM TRANSCENDANT LARGE | [2012/43] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2012 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 16.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 28.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   13.01.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.11.2010 | AL | 27.01.2016 | AT | 27.01.2016 | BE | 27.01.2016 | CY | 27.01.2016 | CZ | 27.01.2016 | DK | 27.01.2016 | EE | 27.01.2016 | ES | 27.01.2016 | FI | 27.01.2016 | HR | 27.01.2016 | IT | 27.01.2016 | LT | 27.01.2016 | LV | 27.01.2016 | MC | 27.01.2016 | MK | 27.01.2016 | NL | 27.01.2016 | PL | 27.01.2016 | RO | 27.01.2016 | RS | 27.01.2016 | SE | 27.01.2016 | SI | 27.01.2016 | SK | 27.01.2016 | SM | 27.01.2016 | TR | 27.01.2016 | BG | 27.04.2016 | NO | 27.04.2016 | GR | 28.04.2016 | IS | 27.05.2016 | PT | 27.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 16.11.2010 | |
AT | 27.01.2016 | ||
BE | 27.01.2016 | ||
CY | 27.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
MC | 27.01.2016 | ||
MK | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SI | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
TR | 27.01.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 16.11.2010 | |
AT | 27.01.2016 | ||
BE | 27.01.2016 | ||
CY | 27.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
MC | 27.01.2016 | ||
MK | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SI | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
BE | 27.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SI | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
BE | 27.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 27.01.2016 | |
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 27.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2569367 (BRADNER DONALD B, et al) [A] 1-4 * column 6, lines 50-60 ** column 9, line 39 - column 10, line 71 *; | [Y]US3728066 (STADLER H, et al) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH09207151 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0026] , [0036]; figure -; claim -; table 1 *; | [Y]US2005212172 (SAKAMAKI SATOSHI [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * page 15, paragraphs 153,154 *; | [A]WO2008023502 (KONICA MINOLTA OPTO INC [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | International search | [A]EP0501738 (XEROX CORP [US]); | [A]EP1477830 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [A]JP2005104148 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [A]US2007281112 (SHI ZEMIN [JP], et al); | [A]US2008177242 (CHANG ANDY C [US], et al) | by applicant | US2569367 | US3728066 | JPH09207151 | US2005212172 | WO2008023502 |