EP2513224 - CONDUCTIVE TANK SUMP AND DISPENSER SUMP, AND METHOD OF EARTHING PROCESS OF THE SAME, AND ELECTRICALLY-CONDUCTIVE COMPOSITION FOR FABRICATION OF TANK SUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KPS Fueling Solutions Snd. Bhd. 14, Jalan Teknologi 3/1, Section 3 Selangor Science Park 1 Kota Damansara 47810 Petaling Jaya Selangor Darul Ehsan / MY | [2014/39] |
Former [2012/43] | For all designated states Guardian Venture Oil&Gas Sdn. Bhd. 25-31, Jalan Apollo U5/186 Seksyen U5 Bandar Pinggiran Subang 40150 Shah Alam Selangor Darul Ehsan / MY | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOSEPH, Brian John (NRIC NO. 590616-10-6659) P 07-04 Selat Horizon Condo Klebang Melaka / MY | [2012/43] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [2012/43] | Stones, James Alexander Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 10837935.5 | 15.12.2010 | WO2010MY00320 | Priority number, date | WO2009MY00206 | 15.12.2009 Original published format: PCT/MY2009/000206 | [2012/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011074940 | Date: | 23.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2513224 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 23.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/06, C08K3/04, H01B1/24 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
B67D7/3209 (EP,US);
B67D7/3236 (EP,US);
B67D7/78 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0402 (EP,US);
Y10T137/85978 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49117 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Extension states | BA | 13.07.2012 | ME | 13.07.2012 | Title | German: | LEITENDE TANKWANNE UND SPENDERWANNE, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER ERDUNG UND ELEKTRISCH LEITENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER TANKWANNE | [2012/43] | English: | CONDUCTIVE TANK SUMP AND DISPENSER SUMP, AND METHOD OF EARTHING PROCESS OF THE SAME, AND ELECTRICALLY-CONDUCTIVE COMPOSITION FOR FABRICATION OF TANK SUMP | [2012/43] | French: | SIPHON DE CUVE CONDUCTEUR ET SIPHON DISTRIBUTEUR, PROCÉDÉ DE MISE À LA TERRE DE CELUI-CI, ET COMPOSITION ÉLECTRIQUEMENT CONDUCTRICE POUR LA FABRICATION DUDIT SIPHON DE CUVE | [2012/43] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 13.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 01.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/02] | 27.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0099717 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO PLC [GB]); | [X]US2008096032 (GUHA PROBIR K [US], et al); | [X]DE2022848 (LICENTIA TALALMANYOKAT FERTEKE); | [A]US5545679 (BOLLINGER JR PARKER A [US], et al); | [A]US2007007495 (HAYES RICHARD A [US]); | [A]US6852790 (THIELEN ALAIN [BE], et al); | [A]GB2031924 (M & G TANKERS LTD) |