EP2533739 - IN-EAR DEVICE WITH SELECTABLE FREQUENCY RESPONSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sonomax Technologies Inc. 8375 Mayrand Street Montréal, Québec H4P 2E2 / CA | [2012/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOIX, Jérémie 7713 Henri-Julien Montréal Québec H2R 2B6 / CA | 02 /
LAPERLE, Jean-Nicholas 4020 St-Ambroise 458 Montréal Québec H4C 2C7 / CA | [2012/51] | Representative(s) | Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG Biberstraße 22 Postfach 36 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/26] | Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG Siebensterngasse 54 A-1071 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2012/51] | Chanza Jordan, Dionisio Plaza Alfonso el Magnanimo, 13 46003 Valencia / ES | Application number, filing date | 10838473.6 | 24.12.2010 | WO2010CA02044 | Priority number, date | US20090282176P | 24.12.2009 Original published format: US 282176 P | [2012/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011075840 | Date: | 30.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2533739 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 30.06.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61F11/08, H04R25/02 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
A61F11/08 (EP,US);
A61F11/085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/51] | Title | German: | OHRINTERNE VORRICHTUNG MIT WÄHLBARER FREQUENZREAKTION | [2012/51] | English: | IN-EAR DEVICE WITH SELECTABLE FREQUENCY RESPONSE | [2012/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF INTRA-AURICULAIRE À RÉPONSE EN FRÉQUENCE SÉLECTIONNABLE | [2012/51] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2012 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 31.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/51] | 20.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/48] | 27.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.08.2013 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees MT, ES, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 31.10.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 31.10.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.11.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 31.10.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 31.10.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.11.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 31.10.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 31.10.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.11.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 31.10.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 31.10.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.11.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.06.2015 | 31.12.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1629809 (PHONAK AG [CH]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024]; figure 1 *; | [A]US6082485 (SMITH ERIC B [US]) [A] 1-16 * column 2, line 24 - page 3, line 37; figures 1-3 * | International search | [Y]US1276498 (CURRAN JOHN W [US]); | [Y]US5832094 (LE HER FRANCOIS [FR]); | [A]EP1498092 (POISSENOT RUTH [CH]) |