Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8814426 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2014 | B2 | US2012236902 | 20.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009295857 | 25.12.2009 | WO2010JP72436 | 14.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101840480B | Global Dossier | 20.03.2018 | B1 | KR20120120179 | 01.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009295857 | 25.12.2009 | WO2010JP72436 | 14.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5832007B | Global Dossier | 16.12.2015 | B2 | JP2011149920 | 04.08.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2010170876 | 29.07.2010 | JP2009295857 | 25.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102667431B | Global Dossier | 20.08.2014 | B | CN102667431 | 12.09.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009295857 | 25.12.2009 | WO2010JP72436 | 14.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2518461 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2017 | B1 | EP2518461 | 01.04.2015 | A4 | EP2518461 | 31.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009295857 | 25.12.2009 | WO2010JP72436 | 14.12.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011078004 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009295857 | 25.12.2009 |