EP2517368 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IMPROVING WIRELESS LINK ROBUSTNESS USING SPATIAL DIVERSITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2019 [2019/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Minyoung 12694 NW Milazzo Ln. Portland Oregon 97229 / US | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | HGF Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | Jennings, Vincent Louis Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield, South Yorkshire S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10839972.6 | 02.12.2010 | WO2010US58734 | Priority number, date | US20090647233 | 24.12.2009 Original published format: US 647233 | [2012/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011078951 | Date: | 30.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2517368 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.10.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/04, H04B7/06 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
H04B7/0695 (EP,US);
H04B7/0617 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/44] | H04B7/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER ROBUSTHEIT VON DRAHTLOSVERKNÜPFUNGEN MITHILFE RÄUMLICHER DIVERSITÄT | [2012/44] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IMPROVING WIRELESS LINK ROBUSTNESS USING SPATIAL DIVERSITY | [2012/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'AMÉLIORATION DE ROBUSTESSE DE LIAISON SANS FIL À L'AIDE D'UNE DIVERSITÉ SPATIALE | [2012/44] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 10.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/16] | 12.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1843485 (SONY DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-12,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0026]; figure 26; claims 17-19 *; | [X]US2009232240 (LAKKIS ISMAIL [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0131] - [0138]; figure 11 * * paragraph [0144] - paragraph [0148]; figure 13 * * paragraph [0139]; figure 27 * * paragraph [0140] - paragraph [0141]; figure 28 *; | [X]WO2009137092 (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA], et al) [X] 1-3,6-12,14 * figure 5A * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0098] *; | [A] - "IEEE Standard for Information technology - Telecommunications and information exchange between systems - Local and metropolitan area networks - Specific requirements. Part 15.3: Wireless Medium Access Control (MAC) and Physical Layer (PHY) Specifications for High Rate Wireless Personal Area Networks", IEEE STANDARD, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20091012), ISBN 978-0-7381-6050-4, pages c1 - 187, XP017604237 [A] 1-15 * page 147 - page 185 * | [A] - "IEEE Standard for Information technology-- Local and metropolitan area networks-- Specific requirements-- Part 11: Wireless LAN Medium Access Control (MAC)and Physical Layer (PHY) Specifications Amendment 5: Enhancements for Higher Throughput;IEEE Std 802.11n-2009 (Amendment to IEEE Std 802.11-2007", IEEE STANDARD, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20091029), ISBN 978-0-7381-6046-7, pages 1 - 565, XP017694836 [A] 1-15 * page 164 - page 176 * | International search | [A]US2006116092 (UNO MASAHIRO [DE], et al); | [A]US2007098097 (KHAN FAROOQ [US], et al); | [A]US2007249403 (GAO SHIWEI [CA], et al); | [A]US2007253386 (LI QINGHUA [US], et al); | [X]US2008248802 (KRISHNAMOORTHY RAJEEV [US]); | [A]US2009233556 (XIA PENGFEI [US], et al) |