Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
WO2014159604 | ![]() | 02.10.2014 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201313837025 | 15.03.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
WO2013003824 | ![]() | 03.01.2013 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571649 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571648 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571634 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571633 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571679 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571619 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571652 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571632 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571687 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571643 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571642 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571686 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571631 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571650 | 30.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
WO2013003487 | ![]() | 03.01.2013 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
WO2011112229 | ![]() | 24.11.2011 | A3 | |
WO2011112229 | 15.09.2011 | A2 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US33994110 | 10.03.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US2025135107 | ![]() | 01.05.2025 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US202519009873 | 03.01.2025 | |||
US202318481857 | 05.10.2023 | |||
US201213532589 | 25.06.2012 | |||
US201313837025 | 15.03.2013 | |||
US202016828914 | 24.03.2020 | |||
US201414244673 | 03.04.2014 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201715674421 | 10.08.2017 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US2024424268 | ![]() | 26.12.2024 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US201615250937 | 30.08.2016 | |||
US202016782959 | 05.02.2020 | |||
US202217728878 | 25.04.2022 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201414245679 | 04.04.2014 | |||
US202418823138 | 03.09.2024 | |||
US33994110 | 10.03.2010 | |||
US201916275586 | 14.02.2019 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
US201816201922 | 27.11.2018 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US2024109959 | ![]() | 04.04.2024 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US202016828736 | 24.03.2020 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US202318481893 | 05.10.2023 | |||
US201161571642 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201213538912 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201615220249 | 26.07.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US2024108694 | ![]() | 04.04.2024 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US202117170479 | 08.02.2021 | |||
US201615009601 | 28.01.2016 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571643 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201916391087 | 22.04.2019 | |||
US201715716259 | 26.09.2017 | |||
US202318481875 | 05.10.2023 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201213538812 | 29.06.2012 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US2024017048 | ![]() | 18.01.2024 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201715832464 | 05.12.2017 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201615043052 | 12.02.2016 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571687 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US202117153283 | 20.01.2021 | |||
US202318457210 | 28.08.2023 | |||
US201916392505 | 23.04.2019 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201213538823 | 29.06.2012 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US2024001094 | ![]() | 04.01.2024 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US202318196813 | 12.05.2023 | |||
US201161571634 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201514620827 | 12.02.2015 | |||
US202017077813 | 22.10.2020 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201916268189 | 05.02.2019 | |||
US201816011457 | 18.06.2018 | |||
US201615339722 | 31.10.2016 | |||
US201213538748 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US2023355717 | ![]() | 09.11.2023 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201213538841 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US202017089366 | 04.11.2020 | |||
US202318136236 | 18.04.2023 | |||
US201715730590 | 11.10.2017 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571652 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201916400707 | 01.05.2019 | |||
US201615048085 | 19.02.2016 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US2023310313 | ![]() | 05.10.2023 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571649 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US202017112458 | 04.12.2020 | |||
US201213538875 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US202318119192 | 08.03.2023 | |||
US201916514967 | 17.07.2019 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201815879308 | 24.01.2018 | |||
US201615197094 | 29.06.2016 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US2023203148 | ![]() | 29.06.2023 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571648 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201213539019 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201916583730 | 26.09.2019 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US202218087151 | 22.12.2022 | |||
US201615192915 | 24.06.2016 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US2022339095 | ![]() | 27.10.2022 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615274155 | 23.09.2016 | |||
US201916384645 | 15.04.2019 | |||
US202016828841 | 24.03.2020 | |||
US202217863322 | 12.07.2022 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201715815499 | 16.11.2017 | |||
US201414500547 | 29.09.2014 | |||
US201213539031 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571631 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US2022202707 | ![]() | 30.06.2022 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US202217696696 | 16.03.2022 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201213538903 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201916412952 | 15.05.2019 | |||
US201161571650 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201715466434 | 22.03.2017 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US2022175890 | ![]() | 09.06.2022 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US202117552325 | 15.12.2021 | |||
US201213538793 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201916405909 | 07.05.2019 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571632 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201715824976 | 28.11.2017 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US2019184144 | ![]() | 20.06.2019 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571634 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201514620827 | 12.02.2015 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201816011457 | 18.06.2018 | |||
US201615339722 | 31.10.2016 | |||
US201213538748 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9844505 | ![]() | 19.12.2017 | B2 | |
US2017231902 | 17.08.2017 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615274155 | 23.09.2016 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201414500547 | 29.09.2014 | |||
US201213539031 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571631 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9956178 | ![]() | 01.05.2018 | B2 | |
US2017049708 | 23.02.2017 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571679 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201615252193 | 30.08.2016 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201213538728 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201414339108 | 23.07.2014 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9907747 | ![]() | 06.03.2018 | B2 | |
US2017027862 | 02.02.2017 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571649 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201213538875 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201615197094 | 29.06.2016 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9808510 | ![]() | 07.11.2017 | B2 | |
US2016166650 | 16.06.2016 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201213538841 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571652 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201615048085 | 19.02.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9844655 | ![]() | 19.12.2017 | B2 | |
US2016158516 | 09.06.2016 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201615043052 | 12.02.2016 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571687 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201213538823 | 29.06.2012 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9814763 | ![]() | 14.11.2017 | B2 | |
US2016144000 | 26.05.2016 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615009601 | 28.01.2016 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571643 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201213538812 | 29.06.2012 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9511121 | ![]() | 06.12.2016 | B2 | |
US2015238571 | 27.08.2015 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571634 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201514620827 | 12.02.2015 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201213538748 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9539207 | ![]() | 10.01.2017 | B2 | |
US2015147390 | 28.05.2015 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201514606923 | 27.01.2015 | |||
US201213538783 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571686 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9492378 | ![]() | 15.11.2016 | B2 | |
US2015023962 | 22.01.2015 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201414500547 | 29.09.2014 | |||
US201213539031 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571631 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9457065 | ![]() | 04.10.2016 | B2 | |
US2014336112 | 13.11.2014 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571679 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201213538728 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201414339108 | 23.07.2014 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9486414 | ![]() | 08.11.2016 | B2 | |
US2014335168 | 13.11.2014 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571633 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201213538770 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201414338796 | 23.07.2014 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9757548 | ![]() | 12.09.2017 | B2 | |
US2014257238 | 11.09.2014 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US201414282864 | 20.05.2014 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US33994110 | 10.03.2010 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9205127 | ![]() | 08.12.2015 | B2 | |
US2014256631 | 11.09.2014 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201213538852 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201414282448 | 20.05.2014 | |||
US201161571619 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9757514 | ![]() | 12.09.2017 | B2 | |
US2014221927 | 07.08.2014 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201213532589 | 25.06.2012 | |||
US201313837025 | 15.03.2013 | |||
US201414244673 | 03.04.2014 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9456988 | ![]() | 04.10.2016 | B2 | |
US2014221912 | 07.08.2014 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201414245679 | 04.04.2014 | |||
US33994110 | 10.03.2010 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US8852151 | ![]() | 07.10.2014 | B2 | |
US2013338583 | 19.12.2013 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US201313970446 | 19.08.2013 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US33994110 | 10.03.2010 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US8734429 | ![]() | 27.05.2014 | B2 | |
US2013274659 | 17.10.2013 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201213532589 | 25.06.2012 | |||
US201313837025 | 15.03.2013 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9402806 | ![]() | 02.08.2016 | B2 | |
US2013195970 | 01.08.2013 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571649 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201213538875 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9259386 | ![]() | 16.02.2016 | B2 | |
US2013189353 | 25.07.2013 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571643 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201213538812 | 29.06.2012 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9402807 | ![]() | 02.08.2016 | B2 | |
US2013177550 | 11.07.2013 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571648 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201213539019 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9629799 | ![]() | 25.04.2017 | B2 | |
US2013177527 | 11.07.2013 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201213538903 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571650 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US8809271 | ![]() | 19.08.2014 | B2 | |
US2013172257 | 04.07.2013 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571633 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201213538770 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9415004 | ![]() | 16.08.2016 | B2 | |
US2013171247 | 04.07.2013 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571642 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201213538912 | 29.06.2012 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9283179 | ![]() | 15.03.2016 | B2 | |
US2013171246 | 04.07.2013 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201213538841 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571652 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9861683 | ![]() | 09.01.2018 | B2 | |
US2013171245 | 04.07.2013 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201213538793 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571632 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US8980822 | ![]() | 17.03.2015 | B2 | |
US2013171244 | 04.07.2013 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201213538783 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571686 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9149617 | ![]() | 06.10.2015 | B2 | |
US2013165859 | 27.06.2013 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201213532589 | 25.06.2012 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US8969293 | ![]() | 03.03.2015 | B2 | |
US2013165373 | 27.06.2013 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571634 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201213538748 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US8809269 | ![]() | 19.08.2014 | B2 | |
US2013165372 | 27.06.2013 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571679 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201213538728 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US8846040 | ![]() | 30.09.2014 | B2 | |
US2013164373 | 27.06.2013 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571631 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201213539031 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US8764733 | ![]() | 01.07.2014 | B2 | |
US2013164372 | 27.06.2013 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201213538852 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571619 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9284367 | ![]() | 15.03.2016 | B2 | |
US2013164371 | 27.06.2013 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571687 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201213538823 | 29.06.2012 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US8562589 | ![]() | 22.10.2013 | B2 | |
US2012010590 | 12.01.2012 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US33994110 | 10.03.2010 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US8721620 | ![]() | 13.05.2014 | B2 | |
US2011160699 | 30.06.2011 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US33994110 | 10.03.2010 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US8759284 | ![]() | 24.06.2014 | B2 | |
US2011160129 | 30.06.2011 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US33994110 | 10.03.2010 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US12268831 | ![]() | 08.04.2025 | B2 | |
US2022323733 | 13.10.2022 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US201615250937 | 30.08.2016 | |||
US202016782959 | 05.02.2020 | |||
US202217728878 | 25.04.2022 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201414245679 | 04.04.2014 | |||
US33994110 | 10.03.2010 | |||
US201916275586 | 14.02.2019 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
US201816201922 | 27.11.2018 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US12263325 | ![]() | 01.04.2025 | B2 | |
US2024082488 | 14.03.2024 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US202318481857 | 05.10.2023 | |||
US201213532589 | 25.06.2012 | |||
US201313837025 | 15.03.2013 | |||
US202016828914 | 24.03.2020 | |||
US201414244673 | 03.04.2014 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201715674421 | 10.08.2017 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US11844867 | ![]() | 19.12.2023 | B2 | |
US2021196639 | 01.07.2021 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US202117202119 | 15.03.2021 | |||
US201916542041 | 15.08.2019 | |||
US201161571679 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201615252193 | 30.08.2016 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201213538728 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201414339108 | 23.07.2014 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201815948947 | 09.04.2018 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US11814427 | ![]() | 14.11.2023 | B2 | |
US2020308268 | 01.10.2020 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US202016828736 | 24.03.2020 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571642 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201213538912 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201615220249 | 26.07.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US11813314 | ![]() | 14.11.2023 | B2 | |
US2021162016 | 03.06.2021 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US202117170479 | 08.02.2021 | |||
US201615009601 | 28.01.2016 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571643 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201916391087 | 22.04.2019 | |||
US201715716259 | 26.09.2017 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201213538812 | 29.06.2012 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US11806504 | ![]() | 07.11.2023 | B2 | |
US2020289747 | 17.09.2020 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201213532589 | 25.06.2012 | |||
US201313837025 | 15.03.2013 | |||
US202016828914 | 24.03.2020 | |||
US201414244673 | 03.04.2014 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201715674421 | 10.08.2017 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US11771879 | ![]() | 03.10.2023 | B2 | |
US2021138216 | 13.05.2021 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201715832464 | 05.12.2017 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201615043052 | 12.02.2016 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571687 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US202117153283 | 20.01.2021 | |||
US201916392505 | 23.04.2019 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201213538823 | 29.06.2012 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US11684761 | ![]() | 27.06.2023 | B2 | |
US2021038873 | 11.02.2021 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571634 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201514620827 | 12.02.2015 | |||
US202017077813 | 22.10.2020 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201916268189 | 05.02.2019 | |||
US201816011457 | 18.06.2018 | |||
US201615339722 | 31.10.2016 | |||
US201213538748 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US11654182 | ![]() | 23.05.2023 | B2 | |
US2021069298 | 11.03.2021 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201213538841 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US202017089366 | 04.11.2020 | |||
US201715730590 | 11.10.2017 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571652 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201916400707 | 01.05.2019 | |||
US201615048085 | 19.02.2016 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US11638690 | ![]() | 02.05.2023 | B2 | |
US2021085600 | 25.03.2021 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571649 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US202017112458 | 04.12.2020 | |||
US201213538875 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201916514967 | 17.07.2019 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201815879308 | 24.01.2018 | |||
US201615197094 | 29.06.2016 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US11555068 | ![]() | 17.01.2023 | B2 | |
US2020095312 | 26.03.2020 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571648 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201213539019 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201916583730 | 26.09.2019 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201615192915 | 24.06.2016 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US11419812 | ![]() | 23.08.2022 | B2 | |
US2020306177 | 01.10.2020 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615274155 | 23.09.2016 | |||
US201916384645 | 15.04.2019 | |||
US202016828841 | 24.03.2020 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201715815499 | 16.11.2017 | |||
US201414500547 | 29.09.2014 | |||
US201213539031 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571631 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US11376405 | ![]() | 05.07.2022 | B2 | |
US2020139095 | 07.05.2020 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201916293526 | 05.03.2019 | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US201414282864 | 20.05.2014 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US201916723822 | 20.12.2019 | |||
US33994110 | 10.03.2010 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
US201715668421 | 03.08.2017 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US11338118 | ![]() | 24.05.2022 | B2 | |
US2020171287 | 04.06.2020 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US201615250937 | 30.08.2016 | |||
US202016782959 | 05.02.2020 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201414245679 | 04.04.2014 | |||
US33994110 | 10.03.2010 | |||
US201916275586 | 14.02.2019 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
US201816201922 | 27.11.2018 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US11304895 | ![]() | 19.04.2022 | B2 | |
US2019358153 | 28.11.2019 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201213538903 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201916412952 | 15.05.2019 | |||
US201161571650 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201715466434 | 22.03.2017 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US11253686 | ![]() | 22.02.2022 | B2 | |
US2019167960 | 06.06.2019 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US201615250937 | 30.08.2016 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201414245679 | 04.04.2014 | |||
US33994110 | 10.03.2010 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
US201816201922 | 27.11.2018 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US11229684 | ![]() | 25.01.2022 | B2 | |
US2020000885 | 02.01.2020 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201213538793 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201916405909 | 07.05.2019 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571632 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201715824976 | 28.11.2017 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10987499 | ![]() | 27.04.2021 | B2 | |
US2019060624 | 28.02.2019 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US201816036650 | 16.07.2018 | |||
US201414507579 | 06.10.2014 | |||
US201313970446 | 19.08.2013 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US33994110 | 10.03.2010 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10980749 | ![]() | 20.04.2021 | B2 | |
US2020078311 | 12.03.2020 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201916542041 | 15.08.2019 | |||
US201161571679 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201615252193 | 30.08.2016 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201213538728 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201414339108 | 23.07.2014 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201815948947 | 09.04.2018 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10967050 | ![]() | 06.04.2021 | B2 | |
US2019381143 | 19.12.2019 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201514606923 | 27.01.2015 | |||
US201213538783 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201916390871 | 22.04.2019 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201615383730 | 19.12.2016 | |||
US201161571686 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201815971395 | 04.05.2018 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10953077 | ![]() | 23.03.2021 | B2 | |
US2019381148 | 19.12.2019 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615009601 | 28.01.2016 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571643 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201916391087 | 22.04.2019 | |||
US201715716259 | 26.09.2017 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201213538812 | 29.06.2012 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10926073 | ![]() | 23.02.2021 | B2 | |
US2019381297 | 19.12.2019 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201715832464 | 05.12.2017 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201615043052 | 12.02.2016 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571687 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201916392505 | 23.04.2019 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201213538823 | 29.06.2012 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10888517 | ![]() | 12.01.2021 | B2 | |
US2020009045 | 09.01.2020 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571649 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201213538875 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201916514967 | 17.07.2019 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201815879308 | 24.01.2018 | |||
US201615197094 | 29.06.2016 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10874840 | ![]() | 29.12.2020 | B2 | |
US2020139094 | 07.05.2020 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571634 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201514620827 | 12.02.2015 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201916268189 | 05.02.2019 | |||
US201816011457 | 18.06.2018 | |||
US201615339722 | 31.10.2016 | |||
US201213538748 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10864254 | ![]() | 15.12.2020 | B2 | |
US2019388509 | 26.12.2019 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201213538841 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201715730590 | 11.10.2017 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571652 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201916400707 | 01.05.2019 | |||
US201615048085 | 19.02.2016 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10752681 | ![]() | 25.08.2020 | B2 | |
US2017174758 | 22.06.2017 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571642 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201213538912 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201615220249 | 26.07.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10639272 | ![]() | 05.05.2020 | B2 | |
US2019314270 | 17.10.2019 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615274155 | 23.09.2016 | |||
US201916384645 | 15.04.2019 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201715815499 | 16.11.2017 | |||
US201414500547 | 29.09.2014 | |||
US201213539031 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571631 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10632251 | ![]() | 28.04.2020 | B2 | |
US2018008771 | 11.01.2018 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201213532589 | 25.06.2012 | |||
US201313837025 | 15.03.2013 | |||
US201414244673 | 03.04.2014 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201715674421 | 10.08.2017 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10603475 | ![]() | 31.03.2020 | B2 | |
US2019175890 | 13.06.2019 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US201615250937 | 30.08.2016 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201414245679 | 04.04.2014 | |||
US33994110 | 10.03.2010 | |||
US201916275586 | 14.02.2019 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
US201816201922 | 27.11.2018 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10596359 | ![]() | 24.03.2020 | B2 | |
US2019192837 | 27.06.2019 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201916293526 | 05.03.2019 | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US201414282864 | 20.05.2014 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US33994110 | 10.03.2010 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
US201715668421 | 03.08.2017 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10548850 | ![]() | 04.02.2020 | B2 | |
US2018221287 | 09.08.2018 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571679 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201615252193 | 30.08.2016 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201213538728 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201414339108 | 23.07.2014 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201815948947 | 09.04.2018 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10493253 | ![]() | 03.12.2019 | B2 | |
US2019160270 | 30.05.2019 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US201916265629 | 01.02.2019 | |||
US201414282864 | 20.05.2014 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US33994110 | 10.03.2010 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
US201715668421 | 03.08.2017 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10487145 | ![]() | 26.11.2019 | B2 | |
US2017081399 | 23.03.2017 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571648 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201213539019 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201615192915 | 24.06.2016 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10478396 | ![]() | 19.11.2019 | B2 | |
US2018228726 | 16.08.2018 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571649 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201213538875 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201815879308 | 24.01.2018 | |||
US201615197094 | 29.06.2016 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10350163 | ![]() | 16.07.2019 | B2 | |
US2017189659 | 06.07.2017 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201213538903 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571650 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201715466434 | 22.03.2017 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10335463 | ![]() | 02.07.2019 | B2 | |
US2018221452 | 09.08.2018 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201213538793 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571632 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201715824976 | 28.11.2017 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10322167 | ![]() | 18.06.2019 | B2 | |
US2019134158 | 09.05.2019 | A9 | ||
US2018193420 | 12.07.2018 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201213538841 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201715730590 | 11.10.2017 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571652 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201615048085 | 19.02.2016 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10314892 | ![]() | 11.06.2019 | B2 | |
US2018015146 | 18.01.2018 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615009601 | 28.01.2016 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571643 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201715716259 | 26.09.2017 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201213538812 | 29.06.2012 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10314891 | ![]() | 11.06.2019 | B2 | |
US2018353574 | 13.12.2018 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201514606923 | 27.01.2015 | |||
US201213538783 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201615383730 | 19.12.2016 | |||
US201161571686 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201815971395 | 04.05.2018 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10307579 | ![]() | 04.06.2019 | B2 | |
US2018093084 | 05.04.2018 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201715832464 | 05.12.2017 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201615043052 | 12.02.2016 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201161571687 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201213538823 | 29.06.2012 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10300010 | ![]() | 28.05.2019 | B2 | |
US2018169003 | 21.06.2018 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615274155 | 23.09.2016 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201715815499 | 16.11.2017 | |||
US201414500547 | 29.09.2014 | |||
US201213539031 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571631 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10252039 | ![]() | 09.04.2019 | B2 | |
US2018104462 | 19.04.2018 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US201414282864 | 20.05.2014 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US33994110 | 10.03.2010 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
US201715668421 | 03.08.2017 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10179228 | ![]() | 15.01.2019 | B2 | |
US2017050005 | 23.02.2017 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US201615250937 | 30.08.2016 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201414245679 | 04.04.2014 | |||
US33994110 | 10.03.2010 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10039908 | ![]() | 07.08.2018 | B2 | |
US2015025496 | 22.01.2015 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US201414507579 | 06.10.2014 | |||
US201313970446 | 19.08.2013 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US33994110 | 10.03.2010 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10029080 | ![]() | 24.07.2018 | B2 | |
US2017043144 | 16.02.2017 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571634 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201514620827 | 12.02.2015 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201615339722 | 31.10.2016 | |||
US201213538748 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10004783 | ![]() | 26.06.2018 | B2 | |
US2017100459 | 13.04.2017 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201514606923 | 27.01.2015 | |||
US201213538783 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97823310 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US97830110 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US201615383730 | 19.12.2016 | |||
US201161571686 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US97816410 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP2024074923 | ![]() | 31.05.2024 | A | |
Priority number | Date | |||
JP2020127039 | 28.07.2020 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
JP2022009746 | 25.01.2022 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP2024036622 | ![]() | 15.03.2024 | A | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201313837025 | 15.03.2013 | |||
JP2022133795 | 25.08.2022 | |||
JP2020182430 | 30.10.2020 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP2023116591 | ![]() | 22.08.2023 | A | |
Priority number | Date | |||
JP2020002601 | 10.01.2020 | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
JP2021072584 | 22.04.2021 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP7434462B | ![]() | 20.02.2024 | B2 | |
JP2022162094 | 21.10.2022 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201313837025 | 15.03.2013 | |||
JP2020182430 | 30.10.2020 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP7305008B | ![]() | 07.07.2023 | B2 | |
JP2022126686 | 30.08.2022 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571649 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571648 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571634 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571633 | 29.06.2011 | |||
JP2020132281 | 04.08.2020 | |||
US201161571679 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571619 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571652 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571632 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571687 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571643 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571642 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571686 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571631 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571650 | 30.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP2022044726 | ![]() | 17.03.2022 | A | |
Priority number | Date | |||
JP2020127039 | 28.07.2020 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP7616937B | ![]() | 17.01.2025 | B2 | |
JP2021112609 | 05.08.2021 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
JP2020002601 | 10.01.2020 | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP2021020110 | ![]() | 18.02.2021 | A | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201313837025 | 15.03.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP7102470B | ![]() | 19.07.2022 | B2 | |
JP2020192342 | 03.12.2020 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571649 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571648 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571634 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571633 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571679 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571619 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571652 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571632 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571687 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571643 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571642 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571686 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571631 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571650 | 30.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP7016387B | ![]() | 04.02.2022 | B2 | |
JP2020171801 | 22.10.2020 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP7590811B | ![]() | 27.11.2024 | B2 | |
JP2020058871 | 16.04.2020 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
JP2018046568 | 14.03.2018 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP2019069206 | ![]() | 09.05.2019 | A | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201313837025 | 15.03.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP6742383B | ![]() | 19.08.2020 | B2 | |
JP2019055197 | 11.04.2019 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP6745866B | ![]() | 26.08.2020 | B2 | |
JP2019043967 | 22.03.2019 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571649 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571648 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571634 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571633 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571679 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571619 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571652 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571632 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571687 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571643 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571642 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571686 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571631 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571650 | 30.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP2018165281 | ![]() | 25.10.2018 | A | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US33994110 | 10.03.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP2017113601 | ![]() | 29.06.2017 | A | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP2017105854 | ![]() | 15.06.2017 | A | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US33994110 | 10.03.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP6796484B | ![]() | 09.12.2020 | B2 | |
JP2016511124 | 14.04.2016 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201313837025 | 15.03.2013 | |||
WO2014US24385 | 12.03.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP6663326B | ![]() | 11.03.2020 | B2 | |
JP2016193946 | 17.11.2016 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571649 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571648 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571634 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571633 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571679 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571619 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571652 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571632 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571687 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571643 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571642 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571686 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571631 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571650 | 30.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP6118371B | ![]() | 19.04.2017 | B2 | |
JP2015166392 | 24.09.2015 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US33994110 | 10.03.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP6029664B | ![]() | 24.11.2016 | B2 | |
JP2014520812 | 25.08.2014 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571649 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571648 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571634 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571633 | 29.06.2011 | |||
WO2012US45138 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571679 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571619 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571652 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571632 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571687 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571643 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571642 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571686 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571631 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571650 | 30.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP6101261B | ![]() | 22.03.2017 | B2 | |
JP2014520600 | 25.08.2014 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
WO2012US44441 | 27.06.2012 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP5931757B | ![]() | 08.06.2016 | B2 | |
JP2013522194 | 13.06.2013 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
WO2010US62073 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US33994110 | 10.03.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP2013515576 | ![]() | 09.05.2013 | A | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
WO2010US62070 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
EP4056173 | ![]() | 23.11.2022 | A3 | |
EP4056173 | 14.09.2022 | A2 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
EP18191328 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
EP10840193 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
EP20164025 | 23.12.2010 | |||
WO2010US62070 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
EP3973983 | ![]() | 30.03.2022 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
WO2012US44441 | 27.06.2012 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
EP12804668 | 27.06.2012 | |||
EP19203957 | 27.06.2012 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
EP3964190 | ![]() | 09.03.2022 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
EP14775797 | 12.03.2014 | |||
US201313837025 | 15.03.2013 | |||
WO2014US24385 | 12.03.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
EP3756657 | ![]() | 05.03.2025 | B1 | |
EP3756657 | 30.12.2020 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
EP18191328 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
EP10840193 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
WO2010US62070 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
EP3653224 | ![]() | 20.05.2020 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571649 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571648 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571634 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571633 | 29.06.2011 | |||
WO2012US45138 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571679 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571619 | 30.06.2011 | |||
EP12803759 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571652 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571632 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571687 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571643 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571642 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571686 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571631 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571650 | 30.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
EP3653223 | ![]() | 25.08.2021 | B1 | |
EP3653223 | 20.05.2020 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
WO2012US44441 | 27.06.2012 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
EP12804668 | 27.06.2012 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
EP3603624 | ![]() | 05.02.2020 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
WO2010US62073 | 23.12.2010 | |||
EP10847622 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US33994110 | 10.03.2010 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
EP3461478 | ![]() | 22.04.2020 | B1 | |
EP3461478 | 03.04.2019 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
EP10840193 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
WO2010US62070 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
EP2968071 | ![]() | 04.08.2021 | B1 | |
EP2968071 | 05.10.2016 | A4 | ||
EP2968071 | 20.01.2016 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201313837025 | 15.03.2013 | |||
WO2014US24385 | 12.03.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
EP2726141 | ![]() | 25.12.2019 | B1 | |
EP2726141 | 06.05.2015 | A4 | ||
EP2726141 | 07.05.2014 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
WO2012US44441 | 27.06.2012 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
EP2726091 | ![]() | 22.01.2020 | B1 | |
EP2726091 | 15.04.2015 | A4 | ||
EP2726091 | 07.05.2014 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571649 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571648 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571634 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571633 | 29.06.2011 | |||
WO2012US45138 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571679 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571619 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571652 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571632 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571687 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571643 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571642 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571686 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571631 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571650 | 30.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
EP2544668 | ![]() | 10.07.2019 | B1 | |
EP2544668 | 27.11.2013 | A4 | ||
EP2544668 | 16.01.2013 | A2 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
WO2010US62073 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US33994110 | 10.03.2010 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
CN109008910B | ![]() | 26.07.2024 | B | |
CN109008910 | 18.12.2018 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571649 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571648 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571634 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571633 | 29.06.2011 | |||
WO2012US45138 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571679 | 29.06.2011 | |||
CN201811010516 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571619 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571652 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571632 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571687 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571643 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571642 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571686 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571631 | 30.06.2011 | |||
CN201280041950 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571650 | 30.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
CN105999526B | ![]() | 05.07.2019 | B | |
CN105999526 | 12.10.2016 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
CN201080064664 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
CN105263461B | ![]() | 10.09.2019 | B | |
CN105263461 | 20.01.2016 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201313837025 | 15.03.2013 | |||
WO2014US24385 | 12.03.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
CN105168174B | ![]() | 08.01.2019 | B | |
CN105168174 | 23.12.2015 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
CN201080066694 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US33994110 | 10.03.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
CN104023740B | ![]() | 02.10.2018 | B | |
CN104023740 | 03.09.2014 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571649 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571648 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571634 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571633 | 29.06.2011 | |||
WO2012US45138 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571679 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571619 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571652 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571632 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571687 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571643 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571642 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571686 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571631 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571650 | 30.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
CN103987422B | ![]() | 15.02.2017 | B | |
CN103987422 | 13.08.2014 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
WO2012US44441 | 27.06.2012 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
CN103025319B | ![]() | 01.07.2015 | B | |
CN103025319 | 03.04.2013 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
WO2010US62073 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US33994110 | 10.03.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
CN102905753B | ![]() | 29.06.2016 | B | |
CN102905753 | 30.01.2013 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
WO2010US62070 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
CA3070695 | ![]() | 23.01.2024 | C | |
CA3070695 | 03.01.2013 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571649 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571648 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571634 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571633 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571679 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571619 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571652 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571632 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571687 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571643 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571642 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571686 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571631 | 30.06.2011 | |||
CA2840617 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571650 | 30.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
CA2901923 | ![]() | 07.12.2021 | C | |
CA2901923 | 02.10.2014 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201313837025 | 15.03.2013 | |||
WO2014US24385 | 12.03.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
CA2840617 | ![]() | 24.03.2020 | C | |
CA2840617 | 03.01.2013 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571649 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571648 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571634 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571633 | 29.06.2011 | |||
WO2012US45138 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571679 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571619 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571652 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571632 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571687 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571643 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571642 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571686 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571631 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571650 | 30.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
CA2840487 | ![]() | 27.09.2022 | C | |
CA2840487 | 03.01.2013 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
WO2012US44441 | 27.06.2012 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
CA2792862 | ![]() | 06.03.2018 | C | |
CA2792862 | 15.09.2011 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
WO2010US62073 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US33994110 | 10.03.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
CA2785168 | ![]() | 17.04.2018 | C | |
CA2785168 | 30.06.2011 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
WO2010US62070 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2023222952 | ![]() | 21.09.2023 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
AU2021203778 | 08.06.2021 | |||
US201313837025 | 15.03.2013 | |||
AU2023222952 | 31.08.2023 | |||
AU2019201008 | 13.02.2019 | |||
AU2014240401 | 12.03.2014 | |||
WO2014US24385 | 12.03.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2023202150B | ![]() | 20.02.2025 | B2 | |
AU2023202150 | 04.05.2023 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
AU2023202150 | 06.04.2023 | |||
AU2020200413 | 21.01.2020 | |||
AU2020294353 | 31.12.2020 | |||
WO2012US44441 | 27.06.2012 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
AU2017206226 | 20.07.2017 | |||
AU2012275417 | 27.06.2012 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2022263569B | ![]() | 06.03.2025 | B2 | |
AU2022263569 | 08.12.2022 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
AU2022263569 | 04.11.2022 | |||
AU2010336330 | 23.12.2010 | |||
AU2016208382 | 28.07.2016 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
AU2020203067 | 08.05.2020 | |||
AU2018203418 | 15.05.2018 | |||
WO2010US62070 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2021203778B | ![]() | 01.06.2023 | B2 | |
AU2021203778 | 22.07.2021 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
AU2021203778 | 08.06.2021 | |||
US201313837025 | 15.03.2013 | |||
AU2019201008 | 13.02.2019 | |||
AU2014240401 | 12.03.2014 | |||
WO2014US24385 | 12.03.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2020294353B | ![]() | 12.01.2023 | B2 | |
AU2020294353 | 25.02.2021 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
AU2020200413 | 21.01.2020 | |||
AU2020294353 | 31.12.2020 | |||
WO2012US44441 | 27.06.2012 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
AU2017206226 | 20.07.2017 | |||
AU2012275417 | 27.06.2012 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2020203067B | ![]() | 04.08.2022 | B2 | |
AU2020203067 | 28.05.2020 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
AU2010336330 | 23.12.2010 | |||
AU2016208382 | 28.07.2016 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
AU2020203067 | 08.05.2020 | |||
AU2018203418 | 15.05.2018 | |||
WO2010US62070 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2020200413B | ![]() | 08.10.2020 | B2 | |
AU2020200413 | 13.02.2020 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
AU2020200413 | 21.01.2020 | |||
WO2012US44441 | 27.06.2012 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
AU2017206226 | 20.07.2017 | |||
AU2012275417 | 27.06.2012 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2019201724B | ![]() | 16.07.2020 | B2 | |
AU2019201724 | 04.04.2019 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
AU2016250444 | 28.10.2016 | |||
AU2010347732 | 23.12.2010 | |||
WO2010US62073 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US33994110 | 10.03.2010 | |||
AU2019201724 | 13.03.2019 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2019201008B | ![]() | 25.03.2021 | B2 | |
AU2019201008 | 07.03.2019 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201313837025 | 15.03.2013 | |||
AU2019201008 | 13.02.2019 | |||
AU2014240401 | 12.03.2014 | |||
WO2014US24385 | 12.03.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2018203418B | ![]() | 27.02.2020 | B2 | |
AU2018203418 | 07.06.2018 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
AU2010336330 | 23.12.2010 | |||
AU2016208382 | 28.07.2016 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
AU2018203418 | 15.05.2018 | |||
WO2010US62070 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2017206226B | ![]() | 24.10.2019 | B2 | |
AU2017206226 | 03.08.2017 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
WO2012US44441 | 27.06.2012 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
AU2017206226 | 20.07.2017 | |||
AU2012275417 | 27.06.2012 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2016250444B | ![]() | 20.12.2018 | B2 | |
AU2016250444 | 17.11.2016 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
AU2016250444 | 28.10.2016 | |||
AU2010347732 | 23.12.2010 | |||
WO2010US62073 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US33994110 | 10.03.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2016208382B | ![]() | 15.02.2018 | B2 | |
AU2016208382 | 18.08.2016 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
AU2010336330 | 23.12.2010 | |||
AU2016208382 | 28.07.2016 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
WO2010US62070 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2014240401B | ![]() | 15.11.2018 | B2 | |
AU2014240401 | 10.09.2015 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201313837025 | 15.03.2013 | |||
WO2014US24385 | 12.03.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2012275417B | ![]() | 31.08.2017 | B9 | |
AU2012275417B | 20.04.2017 | B2 | ||
AU2012275417 | 23.01.2014 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
WO2012US44441 | 27.06.2012 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2012275112B | ![]() | 06.07.2017 | B2 | |
AU2012275112 | 23.01.2014 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571649 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571648 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571634 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571633 | 29.06.2011 | |||
WO2012US45138 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571679 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571619 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571652 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571632 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571687 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571643 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571642 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571686 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571631 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571650 | 30.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2010347732 | ![]() | 04.10.2012 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
WO2010US62073 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US33994110 | 10.03.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2010336330B | ![]() | 28.04.2016 | B2 | |
AU2010336330 | 12.07.2012 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
WO2010US62070 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
EP2515992 | ![]() | 06.11.2024 | B2 | |
EP2515992 | 10.10.2018 | B1 | ||
EP2515992 | 28.08.2013 | A4 | ||
EP2515992 | 31.10.2012 | A2 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
WO2010US62070 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
CA3104670 | 02.10.2014 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201313837025 | 15.03.2013 | |||
CA2901923 | 12.03.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
CA3159845 | 03.01.2013 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
CA2840487 | 27.06.2012 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
CA3240667 | 02.10.2014 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201313837025 | 15.03.2013 | |||
CA3104670 | 12.03.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
DK2726091T | 09.03.2020 | T3 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571649 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571648 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571634 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571633 | 29.06.2011 | |||
WO2012US45138 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571679 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571619 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571652 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571632 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571687 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571643 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571642 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571686 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571631 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571650 | 30.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
DK2726141T | 02.03.2020 | T3 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
WO2012US44441 | 27.06.2012 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
DK2968071T | 08.11.2021 | T3 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201313837025 | 15.03.2013 | |||
WO2014US24385 | 12.03.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
DK3461478T | 27.07.2020 | T3 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
EP10840193 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
DK3653223T | 15.11.2021 | T3 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
EP12804668 | 27.06.2012 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
ES2765029T | 05.06.2020 | T3 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
WO2012US44441 | 27.06.2012 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
ES2773115T | 09.07.2020 | T3 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571649 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571648 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571634 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571633 | 29.06.2011 | |||
WO2012US45138 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571679 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571619 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571652 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571632 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571687 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571643 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571642 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571686 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571631 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571650 | 30.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
ES2897795T | 02.03.2022 | T3 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201313837025 | 15.03.2013 | |||
WO2014US24385 | 12.03.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
ES2898893T | 09.03.2022 | T3 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
IN338CHENP2014 | 03.04.2015 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
WO2012US44441 | 27.06.2012 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
PL2726091T | 10.08.2020 | T3 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571649 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571648 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571634 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571633 | 29.06.2011 | |||
WO2012US45138 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571679 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571619 | 30.06.2011 | |||
EP12803759 | 29.06.2012 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571652 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571632 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571687 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571643 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571642 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571686 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571631 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571650 | 30.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
PL2726141T | 15.06.2020 | T3 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
WO2012US44441 | 27.06.2012 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
EP12804668 | 27.06.2012 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
PL2968071T | 20.12.2021 | T3 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
EP14775797 | 12.03.2014 | |||
US201313837025 | 15.03.2013 | |||
WO2014US24385 | 12.03.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
PL3461478T | 21.09.2020 | T3 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
EP18191328 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
EP10840193 | 23.12.2010 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
WO2010US62070 | 23.12.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
PL3653223T | 20.12.2021 | T3 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
WO2012US44441 | 27.06.2012 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
EP12804668 | 27.06.2012 | |||
EP19203957 | 27.06.2012 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
PT2726091T | 22.04.2020 | T | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571649 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571648 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571634 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571633 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571679 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571619 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571652 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571632 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571687 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571643 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571642 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571686 | 29.06.2011 | |||
US201161571631 | 30.06.2011 | |||
US201161571650 | 30.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
PT2726141T | 24.02.2020 | T | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
PT2968071T | 12.11.2021 | T | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201313837025 | 15.03.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
PT3653223T | 06.12.2021 | T | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201161571641 | 29.06.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
WO2011079302 | ![]() | 17.11.2011 | A3 | |
WO2011079302 | 30.06.2011 | A2 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP2018110907 | ![]() | 19.07.2018 | A | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP6484208B | ![]() | 13.03.2019 | B2 | |
JP2017014274 | 19.01.2017 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP2015186590 | ![]() | 29.10.2015 | A | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
ES2804716T | 09.02.2021 | T3 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
PT3461478T | 16.06.2020 | T | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US34033110 | 15.03.2010 | |||
US28476609 | 24.12.2009 | |||
US39530410 | 10.05.2010 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
EP3461478 | ||||
EP3756657 | ||||
EP4056173 |