EP2488558 - PROCESS FOR OBTAINING A BINDER FOR FIBERS AND CURABLE BINDER FOR FIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prefere Resins Holding GmbH Berliner Strasse 9 15537 Erkner / DE | [2015/49] |
Former [2014/20] | For all designated states Dynea Chemicals OY Lautatarhankatu 6 00580 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2012/34] | For all designated states Dynea OY Lautararhankatu 6 00580 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUNTEANU Remus Str. Izvor nr.59 R-505400 Râsnov Judet Brasov / RO | [2012/34] | Representative(s) | Hoyng Rokh Monegier B.V. Rembrandt Tower, 30th Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Derks, Wilbert, et al Hoyng Monegier LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 10840224.9 | 07.10.2010 | WO2010RO00015 | Priority number, date | RO20100000641 | 23.07.2010 Original published format: RO 201000641 | RO20090000830 | 16.10.2009 Original published format: RO 200900830 | [2012/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011112111 | Date: | 15.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2488558 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2488558 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/06, C08F222/08, C08L33/06, C08L35/00 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
C08L33/06 (EP);
C08F220/06 (EP);
C08F222/08 (EP);
C08F8/28 (EP);
C08F8/30 (EP);
C08L35/00 (EP);
C08L35/06 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F220/06, C08F220/44 (EP);
C08F222/08, C08F212/08, C08F220/1804 (EP);
C08F8/30, C08F8/14, C08F222/08 (EP);
C08F8/44, C08F8/12, C08F220/06 (EP);
C08F8/48, C08F8/28, C08F8/12, C08F118/08 (EP);
C08L33/06, C08L29/14, C08L33/02 (EP);
C08L33/06, C08L29/14, C08L33/20 (EP);
C08L35/00, C08L29/14, C08L33/02 (EP); |
Former IPC [2012/34] | C08F8/28, C08L35/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR GEWINNUNG EINES BINDEMITTELS FÜR FASERN UND HÄRTBARES BINDEMITTEL FÜR FASERN | [2012/34] | English: | PROCESS FOR OBTAINING A BINDER FOR FIBERS AND CURABLE BINDER FOR FIBERS | [2012/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR L'OBTENTION D'UN LIANT POUR FIBRES ET LIANT DURCISSABLE POUR FIBRES | [2012/34] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/34] | 15.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 21.01.2015 | CY | 21.01.2015 | EE | 21.01.2015 | IT | 21.01.2015 | LV | 21.01.2015 | MC | 21.01.2015 | MK | 21.01.2015 | MT | 21.01.2015 | NL | 21.01.2015 | PT | 21.01.2015 | RS | 21.01.2015 | SM | 21.01.2015 | BG | 21.04.2015 | GR | 22.04.2015 | IS | 21.05.2015 | IE | 07.10.2015 | LU | 07.10.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/34] | CY | 21.01.2015 | |
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MK | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PT | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SM | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
IE | 07.10.2015 | ||
LU | 07.10.2015 | ||
Former [2018/30] | CY | 21.01.2015 | |
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MK | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SM | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
IE | 07.10.2015 | ||
LU | 07.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | CY | 21.01.2015 | |
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SM | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
IE | 07.10.2015 | ||
LU | 07.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CY | 21.01.2015 | |
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SM | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
IE | 07.10.2015 | ||
LU | 07.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | EE | 21.01.2015 | |
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
IE | 07.10.2015 | ||
LU | 07.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | EE | 21.01.2015 | |
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
LU | 07.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | EE | 21.01.2015 | |
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
LU | 07.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | EE | 21.01.2015 | |
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | EE | 21.01.2015 | |
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | LV | 21.01.2015 | |
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | BG | 21.04.2015 | |
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | BG | 21.04.2015 | |
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | BG | 21.04.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5498658 (POURAHMADY NASER [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * column 1, line 30 - line 50 * * sentence 6 - sentence 17; example 1 *; | [Y]WO02051936 (GEORGIA PACIFIC RESINS [US]) [Y] 1-7 * claim 1 *; | [Y]US2009118424 (STARK KURT [DE]) [Y] 1-7 * paragraphs [0009] , [0 29] *; | [Y] - TARO OMURA ET AL, "IMPROVEMENT OF THE CROSSLINKING REACTIVITY OF POLYVINYL ACETAL AS AN ALTERNATIVE TO POLYVINYL CHLORIDE", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19960901), vol. 32, no. 5, doi:10.1109/20.539260, ISSN 0018-9464, pages 4052 - 4054, XP011030918 [Y] 1-7 * page 4052 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/20.539260 | by applicant | US6849683 | EP1047645 | WO9422671 |