EP2487855 - METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING GRAPHICS INFORMATION AND APPARATUS AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEM THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHI, Teng Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2012/33] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Postfach 20 07 34 80007 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/04] | Aufhauser, Christoph Epping Hermann Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/33] | Aufhauser, Christoph Epping Hermann Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstraße 55 DE-80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10840588.7 | 30.12.2010 | WO2010CN80487 | Priority number, date | CN200910261821 | 30.12.2009 Original published format: CN200910261821 | [2012/33] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011079801 | Date: | 07.07.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2487855 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2487855 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.07.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, // H04L29/08, G06F17/30 | [2012/40] | CPC: |
H04L67/02 (EP,US);
H04L67/568 (EP,US);
H04L65/65 (EP,US);
H04L67/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/33] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON GRAFIKINFORMATIONEN SOWIE GERÄT UND KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM DAFÜR | [2012/33] | English: | METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING GRAPHICS INFORMATION AND APPARATUS AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEM THEREOF | [2012/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS GRAPHIQUES ET APPAREIL ET SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION ASSOCIÉS | [2012/33] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2012 | Translation filed | 24.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/33] | 27.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 17.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.12.2010 | AL | 21.01.2015 | AT | 21.01.2015 | BE | 21.01.2015 | CY | 21.01.2015 | CZ | 21.01.2015 | DK | 21.01.2015 | EE | 21.01.2015 | ES | 21.01.2015 | FI | 21.01.2015 | HR | 21.01.2015 | IT | 21.01.2015 | LT | 21.01.2015 | LV | 21.01.2015 | MC | 21.01.2015 | MK | 21.01.2015 | MT | 21.01.2015 | NL | 21.01.2015 | PL | 21.01.2015 | PT | 21.01.2015 | RO | 21.01.2015 | RS | 21.01.2015 | SI | 21.01.2015 | SK | 21.01.2015 | SM | 21.01.2015 | TR | 21.01.2015 | BG | 21.04.2015 | NO | 21.04.2015 | GR | 22.04.2015 | IS | 21.05.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/34] | HU | 30.12.2010 | |
AT | 21.01.2015 | ||
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CY | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MK | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PT | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
SM | 21.01.2015 | ||
TR | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 30.12.2010 | |
AT | 21.01.2015 | ||
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CY | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MK | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
SM | 21.01.2015 | ||
TR | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 30.12.2010 | |
AT | 21.01.2015 | ||
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CY | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
SM | 21.01.2015 | ||
TR | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 21.01.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5813008 (BENSON MAX L [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,8,9,13,14 * column 1, line 33 - line 45 * * column 3, line 15 - line 50 * * column 4, line 7 - line 54 * * figure 3 *; | [IAY]US6547829 (MEYERZON DMITRIY [US], et al) [I] 11,12 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 47 * * column 4, line 20 - line 41 * * column 7, line 53 - line 64 * * column 8, line 12 - line 25 * * column 8, line 62 - column 10, line 23 * * figure 3 * [A] 4-7,10,15-17 [Y] 1-3,8,9,13,14; | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Timed Graphics (Release 9)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 26.430, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20091211), no. V1.0.0, pages 1 - 18, XP050400722 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2007192672 (BODIN WILLIAM K [US], et al); | [A]CN101594523 (XUYUAN ZHANG [CN]); | [A]CN101606371 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) |