EP2520231 - SUTURE NEEDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Keisei Medical Industrial Co., Ltd. 19-6, Hongo 3-chome Bunkyo-ku, Tokyo 113-0033 / JP | [2012/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UETAKE, Tsuyoshi c/o KEISEI MEDICAL INDUSTRIAL CO. LTD. 19-6, Hongo 3-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP | [2012/45] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10840956.6 | 24.12.2010 | WO2010JP73383 | Priority number, date | JP20090298915 | 28.12.2009 Original published format: JP 2009298915 | [2012/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011081100 | Date: | 07.07.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2520231 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.07.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/06, B21G1/08, // A61B17/00 | [2016/39] | CPC: |
A61B17/06066 (EP,US);
A61B17/06 (KR);
B21G1/08 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00526 (EP,US);
A61B2017/06028 (EP,US);
A61B2017/06071 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0608 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/45] | A61B17/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/45] | Title | German: | NÄHNADEL | [2012/45] | English: | SUTURE NEEDLE | [2012/45] | French: | AIGUILLE À SUTURE | [2012/45] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2012 | Translation filed | 21.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2012 | Search fee paid | 21.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 21.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/45] | 24.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/41] | 04.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5749897 (MATSUTANI KANJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-16 * column 4, lines 10-56 * * column 6, line 48 - column 7, line 9 * * figures 1,2A-D *; | [XI]DE10259642 (FSSB CHIRURGISCHE NADELN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-7,11,13,14 * paragraphs [0032] - [0035]; figures 1-3 * [I] 4,12; | [XI]US7112208 (MORRIS JOHN K [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7 * column 12, lines 5-18; figures 79-81 *[I] 4,11-14 | International search | [X]JPH03103249 (ETHICON INC); | [A]JPH1170113 (MANII KK); | [X]JP2005532873 (TYCO HEALTHCARE GROUP LP); | [A]JP2005334193 (AKIYAMA SEISAKUSHO KK) | by applicant | JP2000139931 | JP2007268136 |