EP2521429 - METHOD FOR SOLDERING SURFACE-MOUNT COMPONENT AND SURFACE-MOUNT COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SENJU METAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 23 Senju-Hashido-cho Adachi-ku Tokyo, 120-8555 / JP | [2020/03] |
Former [2012/45] | For all designated states Senju Metal Industry Co., Ltd 23 Senju-Hashido-cho Adachi-ku Tokyo 120-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UESHIMA, Minoru c/o SENJU METAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 23 Senju-Hashido-cho Adachi-ku Tokyo 120-8555 / JP | 02 /
TOYODA, Minoru c/o SENJU METAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 23 Senju-Hashido-cho Adachi-ku Tokyo 120-8555 / JP | [2020/37] |
Former [2012/45] | 01 /
UESHIMA, Minoru c/o SENJU METAL INDUSTORY CO. LTD. 23 SENJU-HASHIDO-CHO ADACHI-KU Tokyo 120-8555 / JP | ||
02 /
TOYODA, Minoru c/o SENJU METAL INDUSTORY CO. LTD. 23 SENJU-HASHIDO-CHO ADACHI-KU Tokyo 120-8555 / JP | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/37] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2012/45] | Ealey, Douglas Ralph D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10841068.9 | 22.12.2010 | [2020/37] | WO2010JP73849 | Priority number, date | JP20090298932 | 28.12.2009 Original published format: JP 2009298932 | [2012/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011081213 | Date: | 07.07.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2521429 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2521429 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.07.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/34, H01L21/52, H01L23/31, H01L23/433, H01L23/495, H01L23/00, H01L21/58, H01L21/60 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
H01L23/49582 (EP,US);
H01L21/52 (KR);
H01L21/56 (KR);
H01L23/3107 (EP,US);
H01L23/4334 (EP,US);
H01L23/49513 (EP,US);
H01L24/05 (EP,US);
H01L24/06 (US);
H01L24/29 (EP,US);
H01L24/32 (EP,US);
H01L24/83 (EP,US);
H05K3/34 (KR);
H05K3/3463 (EP,US);
H01L2224/04026 (EP,US);
H01L2224/04042 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05155 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05644 (EP,US);
H01L2224/08501 (US);
H01L2224/29026 (US);
H01L2224/29101 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29109 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29111 (EP,US);
H01L2224/293 (US);
H01L2224/29311 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29447 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32245 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32501 (US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48464 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83192 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83193 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83455 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83801 (EP,US);
H01L2224/85444 (EP,US);
H01L2224/92247 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L24/73 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01004 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01026 (US);
H01L2924/01027 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01028 (US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01047 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01049 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0105 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01051 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01083 (US);
H01L2924/0132 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0133 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0134 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0135 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/10253 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15747 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/04042, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/29101, H01L2924/014, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/29109, H01L2924/01047, H01L2924/0105, H01L2924/01083, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2224/29111, H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29111, H01L2924/01029, H01L2924/01047, H01L2924/01083 (US,EP);
H01L2224/29111, H01L2924/01047 (US,EP);
H01L2224/29111, H01L2924/01047, H01L2924/01083, H01L2924/01083, H01L2924/00012 (EP);
H01L2224/29111, H01L2924/01051, H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00012 (EP);
H01L2224/29111, H01L2924/01082, H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2224/29111, H01L2924/01083 (EP);
H01L2224/29311, H01L2924/01051, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29447, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32145, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2224/83192, H01L2224/32245 (EP,US);
H01L2224/92247, H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00013, H01L2224/29099 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00013, H01L2224/29199 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00013, H01L2224/2929 (EP);
H01L2924/00013, H01L2224/29299 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (US,EP);
H01L2924/0132, H01L2924/01029, H01L2924/0105 (US,EP);
H01L2924/0132, H01L2924/01047, H01L2924/0105 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0132, H01L2924/0105, H01L2924/01051 (US,EP);
H01L2924/0132, H01L2924/0105, H01L2924/01082 (US,EP);
H01L2924/0132, H01L2924/0105, H01L2924/01083 (EP);
H01L2924/0133, H01L2924/01029, H01L2924/01047, H01L2924/0105 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0133, H01L2924/01029, H01L2924/0105, H01L2924/01051 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0133, H01L2924/01047, H01L2924/0105, H01L2924/01083 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0134, H01L2924/01029, H01L2924/01047, H01L2924/0105, H01L2924/01051, H01L2924/01083 (US,EP);
H01L2924/0134, H01L2924/01029, H01L2924/01047, H01L2924/0105, H01L2924/01083 (US,EP);
H01L2924/0134, H01L2924/01047, H01L2924/01049, H01L2924/0105, H01L2924/01083 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0135, H01L2924/01029, H01L2924/01047, H01L2924/01049, H01L2924/0105, H01L2924/01083 (EP,US);
H01L2924/10253, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00012 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3512, H01L2924/00, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00012 (EP,US) (-) |
Former IPC [2016/35] | H05K3/34, H01L21/52, H01L23/31, H01L23/433, H01L23/495, H01L23/00 | ||
Former IPC [2012/45] | H05K3/34, H01L21/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM LÖTEN EINER OBERFLÄCHENMONTIERTEN KOMPONENTE UND OBERFLÄCHENMONTIERTE KOMPONENTE | [2012/45] | English: | METHOD FOR SOLDERING SURFACE-MOUNT COMPONENT AND SURFACE-MOUNT COMPONENT | [2012/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE SOUDER UN COMPOSANT POUR MONTAGE EN SURFACE ET COMPOSANT POUR MONTAGE EN SURFACE | [2012/45] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2012 | Translation filed | 25.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2012 | Search fee paid | 25.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/45] | 21.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 31.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.11.2017 | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2010 | AL | 09.09.2020 | AT | 09.09.2020 | CY | 09.09.2020 | DK | 09.09.2020 | EE | 09.09.2020 | FI | 09.09.2020 | HR | 09.09.2020 | LT | 09.09.2020 | LV | 09.09.2020 | MC | 09.09.2020 | MK | 09.09.2020 | MT | 09.09.2020 | NL | 09.09.2020 | PL | 09.09.2020 | RO | 09.09.2020 | RS | 09.09.2020 | SE | 09.09.2020 | SI | 09.09.2020 | SK | 09.09.2020 | SM | 09.09.2020 | TR | 09.09.2020 | BG | 09.12.2020 | NO | 09.12.2020 | GR | 10.12.2020 | GB | 22.12.2020 | IE | 22.12.2020 | LU | 22.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | IS | 09.01.2021 | PT | 11.01.2021 | [2022/34] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 22.12.2010 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CY | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
MK | 09.09.2020 | ||
MT | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
TR | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
GB | 22.12.2020 | ||
IE | 22.12.2020 | ||
LU | 22.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 22.12.2010 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CY | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
MT | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
TR | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
GB | 22.12.2020 | ||
IE | 22.12.2020 | ||
LU | 22.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
TR | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
GB | 22.12.2020 | ||
IE | 22.12.2020 | ||
LU | 22.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
GB | 22.12.2020 | ||
IE | 22.12.2020 | ||
LU | 22.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
GB | 22.12.2020 | ||
IE | 22.12.2020 | ||
LU | 22.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
GB | 22.12.2020 | ||
IE | 22.12.2020 | ||
LU | 22.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IE | 22.12.2020 | ||
LU | 22.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IE | 22.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 09.09.2020 | |
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | EE | 09.09.2020 | |
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | EE | 09.09.2020 | |
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/18] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH11317487 (NISSAN MOTOR) [Y] 5* paragraphs [0029] , [0043]; figure 1 *; | [Y]JP2001035978 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0023]; figure 9 *; | [YD]JP2001284792 (TANAKA ELECTRONICS IND CO LTD) [YD] 1-9 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0022]; figure 1; table 1 *; | [Y]JP2004034134 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0039]; figure 4 *; | [Y]JP2005340268 (RENESAS TECH CORP) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0028]; figure 6 *; | [Y]JP2008238253 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0022] , [0023]; figure 4 * | International search | [Y]JP2001035978 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JP2001284792 (TANAKA ELECTRONICS IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2002261104 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JP2004034134 (HITACHI LTD) | Examination | US2003019216 | by applicant | JP2001284792 |