EP2519656 - VAPORIZATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/45] | VAPORIZATION APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME | ||
[2017/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SNU Precision Co., Ltd. 1629-2, Bong-chun 7-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-050 / KR | [2017/40] |
Former [2012/45] | For all designated states SNU Precision Co., Ltd. 1629-2, Bong-chun 7-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-050 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEO, Seung Cheol 105-203, Yeonghwa Beullenhaim Apt. Gung-ri Godeok-myeon Pyeongtaek-si Gyeonggi-do 450-747 / KR | 02 /
GONG, Doo Won 301, 1002-14 Sinwol 6-dong Yangcheon-gu Seoul 158-848 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Jong Ha 106-1305, Woosung Apt. Bakdal 2-dong Manan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 430-703 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Kyung Bum 1f, Jinyoung Villa 738-2 Bijeon-dong Pyeongtaek-si Gyeonggi-do 450-150 / KR | 05 /
JUNG, Sung Jae 109-1503, Tapmaeul Sunkyung Apt. Yatap-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-928 / KR | 06 /
CHO, Whang Sin 401, Yesol Heights Ville 7-17, Gusan-dong Eunpyeong-gu Seoul 122-819 / KR | [2017/40] |
Former [2012/45] | 01 /
SEO, Seung Cheol 105-203 Yeonghwa Beullenhaim Apt. Gung-ri Godeok-myeon Pyeongtaek-si Gyeonggi-do 450-747 / KR | ||
02 /
GONG, Doo Won 301, 1002-14 Sinwol 6-dong Yangcheon-gu Seoul 158-848 / KR | |||
03 /
LEE, Jong Ha 106-1305 Woosung Apt. Bakdal 2-dong Manan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 430-703 / KR | |||
04 /
LEE, Kyung Bum 1f Jinyoung Villa 738-2 Bijeon-dong Pyeongtaek-si Gyeonggi-do 450-150 / KR | |||
05 /
JUNG, Sung Jae 109-1503 Tapmaeul Sunkyung Apt. Yatap-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-928 / KR | |||
06 /
CHO, Whang Sin 401 Yesol Heights Ville 7-17 Gusan-dong Eunpyeong-gu Seoul 122-819 / KR | |||
Former [2011/34] | 01 /
SEO, Seung Cheol 105-203 Yeonghwa Beullenhaim Apt. Gung-ri Godeok-myeon Pyeongtaek-si Gyeonggi-do 450-747 / KR | ||
02 /
GONG, Doo Won 301, 1002-14 Sinwol 6-dong Yangcheon-gu Seoul 158-848 / KR | |||
03 /
LEE, Jong Ha 106-1305 Woosung Apt. Bakdal 2-dong Manan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 430-703 / KR | |||
04 /
LEE, Kyung Bum 1f Jinyoung Villa 738-2 Bijeon-dong Pyeongtaek-si Gyeonggi-do 450-150 / KR | |||
05 /
JUNG, Sung Jae 109-1503 Tapmaeul Sunkyung Apt. Yatap-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-928 / KR | |||
06 /
CHO, Whang Sin 401 Yesol Heights Ville 7-17 Gusan-dong Eunpyeong-gu Seoul 122-819 / KR | Representative(s) | Groth & Co. KB P.O. Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | [2017/40] |
Former [2012/45] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Neuer Zollhof 2 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 10841200.8 | 24.12.2010 | [2017/40] | WO2010KR09316 | Priority number, date | KR20090135890 | 31.12.2009 Original published format: KR 20090135890 | [2011/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011081368 | Date: | 07.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2519656 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2519656 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.10.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/24, C23C14/54, B01D1/00, C23C16/448, C23C16/52 | [2014/34] | CPC: |
C23C16/4485 (EP,US);
C23C14/24 (EP,KR,US);
B01D1/0017 (EP,US);
B01D1/0082 (EP,US);
C23C14/543 (EP,US);
C23C16/52 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/34] | C23C14/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERDAMPFUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/18] | English: | VAPORIZATION APPARATUS | [2017/18] | French: | APPAREIL DE VAPORISATION | [2017/18] |
Former [2012/45] | VERDAMPFUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER STEUERUNG | ||
Former [2012/45] | VAPORIZATION APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME | ||
Former [2012/45] | APPAREIL DE VAPORISATION ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2012 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/45] | 12.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.12.2010 | AL | 04.10.2017 | AT | 04.10.2017 | CY | 04.10.2017 | CZ | 04.10.2017 | DK | 04.10.2017 | EE | 04.10.2017 | ES | 04.10.2017 | FI | 04.10.2017 | HR | 04.10.2017 | IT | 04.10.2017 | LT | 04.10.2017 | LV | 04.10.2017 | MC | 04.10.2017 | MK | 04.10.2017 | NL | 04.10.2017 | PL | 04.10.2017 | PT | 04.10.2017 | RO | 04.10.2017 | RS | 04.10.2017 | SE | 04.10.2017 | SI | 04.10.2017 | SK | 04.10.2017 | SM | 04.10.2017 | TR | 04.10.2017 | IE | 24.12.2017 | LU | 24.12.2017 | MT | 24.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | FR | 02.01.2018 | BG | 04.01.2018 | NO | 04.01.2018 | GR | 05.01.2018 | IS | 04.02.2018 | DE | 03.07.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 24.12.2010 | |
AT | 04.10.2017 | ||
CY | 04.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MK | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PT | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 24.12.2017 | ||
LU | 24.12.2017 | ||
MT | 24.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
DE | 03.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 24.12.2010 | |
AT | 04.10.2017 | ||
CY | 04.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MK | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 24.12.2017 | ||
LU | 24.12.2017 | ||
MT | 24.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
DE | 03.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 24.12.2010 | |
AT | 04.10.2017 | ||
CY | 04.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MK | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 24.12.2017 | ||
LU | 24.12.2017 | ||
MT | 24.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
DE | 03.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 24.12.2010 | |
AT | 04.10.2017 | ||
CY | 04.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 24.12.2017 | ||
LU | 24.12.2017 | ||
MT | 24.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
DE | 03.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 24.12.2010 | |
AT | 04.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 24.12.2017 | ||
LU | 24.12.2017 | ||
MT | 24.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
DE | 03.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 24.12.2017 | ||
LU | 24.12.2017 | ||
MT | 24.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
DE | 03.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 24.12.2017 | ||
LU | 24.12.2017 | ||
MT | 24.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
DE | 03.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 24.12.2017 | ||
LU | 24.12.2017 | ||
MT | 24.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
DE | 03.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 24.12.2017 | ||
LU | 24.12.2017 | ||
MT | 24.12.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
DE | 03.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 24.12.2017 | ||
LU | 24.12.2017 | ||
MT | 24.12.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 24.12.2017 | ||
MT | 24.12.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 04.10.2017 | |
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 04.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2008088531 (FUJIFILM CORP) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [Y] 6,7; | [Y]US2007298159 (BENDER MARCUS [DE], et al) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0036] *; | [Y]JPH02138462 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 7 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JP2009084665 (ULVAC CORP); | [Y]JP2006111965 (SHOWA SHINKU KK, et al); | [X]JP2003222472 (TOYOTA IND CORP); | [A]JP2006111926 (HITACHI SHIPBUILDING ENG CO); | [A]KR100926437B (SNU PRECISION CO LTD [KR]); | [A]JP2009084679 (ULVAC CORP) | Examination | US2005229856 | by applicant | JP2008088531 | US2007298159 | JPH02138462 | US2005229856 |