EP2520593 - PREPARATION METHOD OF A SOLID CATALYST FOR POLYPROPYLENE POLYMERIZATION, AND THE SOLID CATALYST OBTAINED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lotte Chemical Corporation (Shindaebang-dong) 51 Boramae-ro 5-gil Dongjak-gu Seoul 156-711 / KR | [2015/19] |
Former [2012/45] | For all designated states Honam Petrochemical Corporation 395-67, Shindaebang-dong Dongjak-gu Seoul 156-711 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIM, Seong Soo 109-801 Daelim Dure Apt. Sinseong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-720 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Young Kook 109-1102 Daelim Dure Apt. Sinseong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-720 / KR | [2012/45] |
Former [2011/34] | 01 /
LIM, Seong Soo 109-801 Daelim Dure Apt. Sinseong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-720 / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Young Kook 109-1102 Daelim Dure Apt. Sinseong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-720 / KR | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2015/25] |
Former [2012/45] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10841239.6 | 28.12.2010 | WO2010KR09422 | Priority number, date | KR20090134776 | 30.12.2009 Original published format: KR 20090134776 | [2011/34] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011081407 | Date: | 07.07.2011 | Language: | KO | [2011/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2520593 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2520593 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.11.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08F4/654, C08F4/02, C08F10/06 | [2011/34] | CPC: |
C08F110/06 (EP,US);
C08F4/654 (KR);
C08F10/06 (KR);
C08F4/02 (KR);
Y02P20/52 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F110/06, C08F2500/18 (US,EP);
C08F110/06, C08F4/6492 (US,EP);
C08F110/06, C08F4/651 (US,EP);
C08F110/06, C08F4/6543 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FESTSTOFFKATALYSATORS ZUR POLYPROPYLEN-POLYMERISIERUNG SOWIE IN DIESEM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTER FESTSTOFFKATALYSATOR | [2012/45] | English: | PREPARATION METHOD OF A SOLID CATALYST FOR POLYPROPYLENE POLYMERIZATION, AND THE SOLID CATALYST OBTAINED THEREFROM | [2012/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN CATALYSEUR SOLIDE POUR POLYMÉRISATION DU POLYPROPYLÈNE, ET CATALYSEUR SOLIDE AINSI OBTENU | [2012/45] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2012 | Translation filed | 30.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/45] | 26.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 07.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.12.2010 | AL | 17.06.2015 | AT | 17.06.2015 | BE | 17.06.2015 | CY | 17.06.2015 | CZ | 17.06.2015 | DK | 17.06.2015 | EE | 17.06.2015 | ES | 17.06.2015 | FI | 17.06.2015 | HR | 17.06.2015 | LT | 17.06.2015 | LV | 17.06.2015 | MC | 17.06.2015 | MK | 17.06.2015 | MT | 17.06.2015 | NL | 17.06.2015 | PL | 17.06.2015 | RO | 17.06.2015 | RS | 17.06.2015 | SE | 17.06.2015 | SI | 17.06.2015 | SK | 17.06.2015 | SM | 17.06.2015 | TR | 17.06.2015 | BG | 17.09.2015 | NO | 17.09.2015 | GR | 18.09.2015 | IS | 17.10.2015 | PT | 19.10.2015 | GB | 28.12.2015 | IE | 28.12.2015 | LU | 28.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | FR | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 28.12.2010 | |
AT | 17.06.2015 | ||
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CY | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MK | 17.06.2015 | ||
MT | 17.06.2015 | ||
NL | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SE | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
SM | 17.06.2015 | ||
TR | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
GB | 28.12.2015 | ||
IE | 28.12.2015 | ||
LU | 28.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 28.12.2010 | |
AT | 17.06.2015 | ||
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CY | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MT | 17.06.2015 | ||
NL | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SE | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
SM | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
GB | 28.12.2015 | ||
IE | 28.12.2015 | ||
LU | 28.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
GB | 28.12.2015 | ||
IE | 28.12.2015 | ||
LU | 28.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
GB | 28.12.2015 | ||
IE | 28.12.2015 | ||
LU | 28.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
GB | 28.12.2015 | ||
IE | 28.12.2015 | ||
LU | 28.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
IE | 28.12.2015 | ||
LU | 28.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
IE | 28.12.2015 | ||
LU | 28.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
LU | 28.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
LU | 28.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 17.06.2015 | |
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US4330649 (KIOKA MAMORU, et al); | [Y]KR910008283B (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [A]US6323150 (KOJOH SHINICHI [JP], et al); | [A]US2007298964 (YANG CHUN-BYUNG [KR], et al) | by applicant | US6323150 | US2007298964 |