EP2574193 - THIOL DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The State Of Oregon Acting By And Through The State Board Of Higher Education On Behalf Of Portland State University 1721 SW Broadway Portland, OR 97207-0751 / US | [2013/27] |
Former [2013/14] | For all designated states Strongin, Robert, M. 537 N. Buffalo St. Portland, OR 97217 / US | ||
For all designated states Sibrian-Vazquez, Martha 2537 SW Spring Garden St. Portland, OR 97219 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRONGIN, Robert, M. 537 N. Buffalo St. Portland OR 97217 / US | 02 /
SIBRIAN-VAZQUEZ, Martha 2537 SW Spring Garden St. Portland OR 97219 / US | [2013/14] | Representative(s) | Wills, Andrew Jonathan, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/14] | Wills, Andrew Jonathan, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 10841755.1 | 30.12.2010 | WO2010US62582 | Priority number, date | US20090335101P | 30.12.2009 Original published format: US 335101 P | [2013/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011082354 | Date: | 07.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2574193 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/14, C07D213/22, C07D493/10, G01N31/22, G01N21/77 | [2013/14] | CPC: |
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D213/22 (EP,US);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
C07D493/10 (EP,US);
G01N31/22 (EP,US);
Y10T436/182 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/14] | Title | German: | NACHWEIS VON THIOL | [2013/14] | English: | THIOL DETECTION | [2013/14] | French: | DÉTECTION D'UN THIOL | [2013/14] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2012 | Examination requested [2013/14] | 20.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/01] | 03.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0188060 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15* page 16; compound II *; | [IY] - M. SIBRIAN-VAZQUEZ ET AL, "Homocystamides promote free-radical and oxidative damage to proteins", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20091218), vol. 107, no. 2, doi:10.1073/pnas.0909737107, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 551 - 554, XP055087675 [I] 1-15 * page 552, left column, last paragraph * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0909737107 | [IY] - SCHRAUZER G N ET AL, "Electron transfer reactions catalyzed by vitamin B12 and related compounds: The reduction of dyes and of riboflavin by thiols", ARCHIVES OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOPHYSICS, ACADEMIC PRESS, US, vol. 130, doi:10.1016/0003-9861(69)90032-0, ISSN 0003-9861, (19690101), pages 257 - 266, (19690101), XP024805813 [I] 1-15 * page 258, right column * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-9861(69)90032-0 | International search | [A]US4769467 (IMAI KAZUHIRO [JP]); | [A]US5130433 (ALBARELLA JAMES P [US], et al); | [A]US2008261315 (STRONGIN ROBERT M [US], et al) |