EP2515668 - COATED MULTI-REGION CONFECTIONERY AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intercontinental Great Brands LLC 100 Deforest Avenue East Hanover, NJ 07936-2813 / US | For all designated states Kent Gida Maddeleri Sanayii Ve Ticaret Anonim Sirketi Cayirova Mah.Ankara Asfalti Uzeri Istanbul Cad. No. 111 Gebze 41400 Kocaeli / TR | [2019/12] |
Former [2018/13] | For all designated states Intercontinental Great Brands LLC Three Lakes Drive Northfield, IL 60093 / US | ||
For all designated states Kent Gida Maddeleri Sanayii Ve Ticaret Anonim Sirketi Cayirova Mah.Ankara Asfalti Uzeri Istanbul Cad. No. 111 Gebze 41400 Kocaeli / TR | |||
Former [2012/44] | For all designated states Kraft Foods Global Brands LLC Three Lakes Drive Northfield, IL 60093 / US | ||
For all designated states Kent Gida Maddeleri Sanayii Ve Ticaret Anonim Sirketi Cayirova Mah.Ankara Asfalti Uzeri Istanbul Cad. No. 111 Gebze 41400 Kocaeli / TR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELEJALDE, Cesar Carlos 1 Village Court Randolph New Jersey 07869 / US | 02 /
TAHINCIOGLU, Edip Nidakule Degirmen sok.18 34742 Kozyatagi-Istanbul / TR | 03 /
LEVI, Albert Unigum Gida Maddeleri San. Tic.A.S Gebze Org. San.Bölgesi Ihsandede Cad. 800 Sk. No.805 41400 Gebze/Kocaeli / TR | 04 /
BAKKAL, Burcu Birecik Kent Gida Maddeleri San.Ve Tic.A.S Cumhuriyet Mah.2253 Sokak No.11 41400 Gebze/Kocaeli / TR | [2019/08] |
Former [2013/03] | 01 /
ELEJALDE, Cesar Carlos 1 Village Court Randolph New Jersey 07869 / US | ||
02 /
TAHINCIOGLU, Edip Nidakule Degirmen sok.18 34742 Kozyatagi-Istanbul / TR | |||
03 /
LEVI, Albert Unigum Gida Maddeleri San. Tlc. A. S. Gebze org. San. Bölgesi Ihsandede Cad. 800 Sk. No. 805 41400 Gebze Kocaeli / TR | |||
04 /
BAKKAL, Burcu Birecik Kent Gida Maddeleri San.Ve Tic.A.S Cumhuriyet Mah.2253 Sokak No.11 41400 Gebze/Kocaeli / TR | |||
Former [2012/44] | 01 /
ELEJALDE, Cesar Carlos 1 Village Court Randolph New Jersey 07869 / US | ||
02 /
TAHINCIOGLU, Edip Nidakule Degirmen sok.18 34742 Kozyatagi-Istanbul / TR | |||
03 /
LEVI, Albert Kent Gida Maddeleri San.Ve Tic.A.S Cumhuriyet Mah.2253 Sokak No.11 41400 Gebze/Kocaeli / TR | |||
04 /
BAKKAL, Burcu Birecik Kent Gida Maddeleri San.Ve Tic.A.S Cumhuriyet Mah.2253 Sokak No.11 41400 Gebze/Kocaeli / TR | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2019/08] |
Former [2012/44] | Pidgeon, Robert John Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10842696.6 | 21.12.2010 | [2019/08] | WO2010US61402 | Priority number, date | US20090288424P | 21.12.2009 Original published format: US 288424 P | [2012/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011084759 | Date: | 14.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2515668 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2515668 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2515668 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.11.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A23L29/30 | [2018/39] | CPC: |
A23G3/38 (EP,US);
A23G3/54 (EP,US);
A23G4/20 (EP,US);
A23L29/37 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/01] | A23G3/50, A23G3/54, A23G4/18, A23G4/20, A23L1/09, A23G3/38 | ||
Former IPC [2012/44] | A23G3/50, A23G3/54, A23G4/18, A23G4/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHICHTETE SÜSSWARE MIT MEHREREN ABSCHNITTEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2012/44] | English: | COATED MULTI-REGION CONFECTIONERY AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME | [2012/44] | French: | CONFISERIE ENROBÉE À PLUSIEURS RÉGIONS ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE RÉALISER CELLE-CI | [2012/44] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 03.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 30.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.11.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.12.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 06.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.09.2017 | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2010 | AL | 20.02.2019 | AT | 20.02.2019 | CY | 20.02.2019 | CZ | 20.02.2019 | DK | 20.02.2019 | EE | 20.02.2019 | FI | 20.02.2019 | HR | 20.02.2019 | IT | 20.02.2019 | LT | 20.02.2019 | LV | 20.02.2019 | MC | 20.02.2019 | MK | 20.02.2019 | MT | 20.02.2019 | NL | 20.02.2019 | RO | 20.02.2019 | RS | 20.02.2019 | SE | 20.02.2019 | SI | 20.02.2019 | SK | 20.02.2019 | SM | 20.02.2019 | TR | 20.02.2019 | BG | 20.05.2019 | NO | 20.05.2019 | GR | 21.05.2019 | IS | 20.06.2019 | PT | 20.06.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 21.12.2010 | |
AL | 20.02.2019 | ||
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CY | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
MT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 21.12.2010 | |
AL | 20.02.2019 | ||
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CY | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CY | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 20.02.2019 | |
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]WO2009135100 (CADBURY ADAMS USA LLC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document * [Y] 1-15; | [Y]US2009142444 (JARRARD JR MARK [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0065] - [0096]; examples 1-3; claims 1-54 *; | [A]EP2025245 (SUEDZUCKER AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * examples 1-3; claims 1-35 * | International search | [X]WO2004089113 (QUEST INT [NL], et al); | [X]WO0219987 (CHR HANSEN INC [US]); | [X]KR100304249B (ROQUETTE FRERES); | [A]US2009214700 (HASSLINGER BERND [DE], et al); | [A]US2009226493 (LOPEZ MICHEL [FR], et al); | [A]US2006099308 (ZUEHLKE JULIUS W [US], et al) | Examination | EP0415656 | US7115288 | by applicant | WO2009135100 | EP0415656 |