Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
01.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] |
17.03.2016 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
02.02.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.07.2015 | Change - classification | published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] |
10.07.2015 | Change - classification | published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] |
10.07.2015 | Change - date of supplementary search report | published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] |
10.07.2015 | Change - inventor | published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] |
04.02.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.04.2014 | Change - applicant | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
07.02.2014 | Change - representative | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
05.02.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.03.2013 | Change - extension states | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] |
06.02.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.10.2012 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
19.10.2012 | Request for examination filed | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
31.07.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.07.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.07.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.07.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.08.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.07.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.07.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication |