EP2524953 - ANISOTROPIC ELECTRICALLY-CONDUCTIVE ADHESIVE AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dexerials Corporation Gate City Osaki East Tower 8th Floor 1-11-2 Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | [2014/21] |
Former [2012/47] | For all designated states Sony Chemical & Information Device Corporation Gate City Osaki East Tower 8F 1-11-2, Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAMIKI Hidetsugu c/o SONY CHEMICAL&INFORMATION DEVICE CORPORATION Kanuma Plant 3 1078 Kami-ishikawa Kanuma-shi Tochigi 322-8503 / JP | 02 /
KANISAWA Shiyuki c/o SONY CHEMICAL&INFORMATION DEVICE CORPORATION Kanuma Plant 3 1078 Kami-ishikawa Kanuma-shi Tochigi 322-8503 / JP | 03 /
KATAYANAGI Genki c/o SONY CHEMICAL&INFORMATION DEVICE CORPORATION Kanuma Plant 3 1078 Kami-ishikawa Kanuma-shi Tochigi 322-8503 / JP | [2012/47] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/47] | Perrey, Ralf, et al Müller-Boré & Partner Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10843039.8 | 15.01.2010 | WO2010JP50370 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011086680 | Date: | 21.07.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2524953 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.07.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C09J163/00, C09J9/02, C09J11/04, C09J11/06, H01B1/22, H01R11/01, H05K1/09, H05K3/22 | [2012/47] | CPC: |
C09J9/02 (EP,KR,US);
C09J163/00 (EP,KR,US);
H01B1/20 (US);
C08L63/00 (US);
C09J11/04 (KR);
H01B1/22 (EP,KR,US);
H01R4/04 (EP,US);
H05K3/321 (EP,US);
C08K5/1515 (EP,US);
C08K5/1539 (EP,US);
H05K1/189 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10106 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10674 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/47] | Title | German: | ANISOTROPES, ELEKTRISCH LEITFÄHIGES HAFTMITTEL | [2012/47] | English: | ANISOTROPIC ELECTRICALLY-CONDUCTIVE ADHESIVE AGENT | [2012/47] | French: | AGENT ADHÉSIF ÉLECTRIQUEMENT CONDUCTEUR ANISOTROPE | [2012/47] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2012 | Translation filed | 12.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 12.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/47] | 11.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/31] | 18.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1120449 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14* the whole document * | International search | [X]JPH0520918 (SONY CHEMICALS); | [X]JPH10259227 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [X]JP2000345010 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC); | [X]JP2001115127 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [X]JP2002201450 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [X]JP2003147306 (FUJITSU LTD); | [Y]JP2004039983 (ROHM CO LTD); | [X]JP2006104273 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [X]JP2007112949 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [XE]WO2010007817 (SONY CHEM & INF DEVICE CORP [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP3342703B |