EP2515943 - MICROCRYSTALLINE CELLULOSE AND CALCIUM CARBONATE COMPOSITIONS USEFUL AS RECOMPACTIBLE PHARMACEUTICAL EXCIPIENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FMC Corporation 1735 Market Street Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | [2012/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOORENS, Gregory Kouter 4 B-1780 Wemmell / BE | 02 /
LECLERCQ, Bruno Avenue Penelope 42 B-1190 Brussels / BE | 03 /
RUSZKAY, Thomas 517 Blackbird Drive Hockessin DE 19707 / US | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | Earnshaw, Geoffrey Mark Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [2012/44] | Application number, filing date | 10843457.2 | 08.12.2010 | WO2010US59403 | Priority number, date | US20090289061P | 22.12.2009 Original published format: US 289061 P | [2012/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011087629 | Date: | 21.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2515943 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.11.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/38, A61K47/30, A61K47/06, A61K9/16, A61K9/14, A61K9/20 | [2012/44] | CPC: |
A61K31/341 (EP,US);
A61K9/2009 (EP,US);
A61K9/2054 (EP,US);
A61K9/2095 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Title | German: | MIKROKRISTALLINE ZELLULOSE UND CALCIUMCARBONATZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ALS WIEDER KOMPRIMIERBARE PHARMAZEUTISCHE HILFSSTOFFE | [2012/44] | English: | MICROCRYSTALLINE CELLULOSE AND CALCIUM CARBONATE COMPOSITIONS USEFUL AS RECOMPACTIBLE PHARMACEUTICAL EXCIPIENTS | [2012/44] | French: | CELLULOSE MICROCRISTALLINE ET COMPOSITIONS DE CARBONATE DE CALCIUM UTILES EN TANT QU'EXCIPIENTS PHARMACEUTIQUES RECOMPACTABLES | [2012/44] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 21.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0193984 (FMC CORP [US]) [Y] 1-19 * claim - * * page 5, line 18 - line 34 *; | [YD]US4744987 (MEHRA DEV K [US], et al) [YD] 1-19 * column 3, line 18 - line 36; claims 1-24 *; | [Y]US5747067 (AUGELLO MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * claims 1-6 * * example - *; | [YD]US2008213360 (THOORENS GREGORY [BE], et al) [YD] 1-19 * example - *; | [XY] - M DE LOURDES GARZÓN ET AL, "Compactibility of mixtures of calcium carbonate and microcrystalline cellulose", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, (20020101), vol. 231, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0378-5173(01)00857-2, ISSN 0378-5173, pages 33 - 41, XP055109524 [X] 1-5,10,13 * Methods; page 35, paragraph 2.2 * [Y] 1-19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-5173(01)00857-2 | [A] - NACHAEGARI S K ET AL, "Coprocessed Excipients for Solid Dosage Forms", PHARMACEUTICAL TECHNOLOGY, ADVANSTAR COMMUNICATIONS,INC, US, (20040101), vol. 28, no. 1, ISSN 1543-2521, pages 52 - 64, XP002337087 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5747067 (AUGELLO MICHAEL [US], et al); | [X]US6037380 (VENABLES AARON C [US], et al); | [A]US2007172524 (KLOBCAR IZTOK [SI], et al) |