EP2514960 - ENGINE STARTING DEVICE AND ENGINE STARTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2012/43] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIYA, Kouki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
KAKEHI, Jumpei c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
BIN HASHIM, Hasrul Sany c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2012/43] | Representative(s) | Smith, Samuel Leonard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2012/43] | Application number, filing date | 10844306.0 | 16.07.2010 | WO2010JP62092 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012008050 | Date: | 19.01.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2514960 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.01.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F02N11/08, F02N11/00, F02N15/00, F02N15/06 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
F02N15/067 (EP,US);
F02N11/0851 (US);
F02N11/0855 (EP,US);
F02D2250/24 (EP,US);
F02D41/042 (EP,US);
F02N2200/0806 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Title | German: | MOTORSTARTVORRICHTUNG UND MOTORSTARTVERFAHREN | [2012/43] | English: | ENGINE STARTING DEVICE AND ENGINE STARTING METHOD | [2012/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DEMARRAGE DE MOTEUR ET PROCEDE DE DEMARRAGE DE MOTEUR | [2012/43] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2011 | Translation filed | 01.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 01.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 01.08.2011 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 20.02.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2005330813 (DENSO CORP) [AD] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]JP2007016618 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-9* figures 2A, 2B *; | [A]DE102008041037 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0037] - [0040] * * paragraphs [0057] - [0063] * | International search | [A]JP2001073911 (DENSO CORP); | [Y]JP2002115631 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2005030348 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [Y]EP2159410 (DENSO CORP [JP]) |