EP2530520 - ILLUMINATION OPTICAL SYSTEM AND PROJECTOR USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Display Solutions, Ltd. 4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0073 / JP | [2012/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAITOU, Hiroyuki c/o NEC Display Solutions Ltd. 4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0073 / JP | 02 /
KATOU, Atsushi c/o NEC Display Solutions Ltd. 4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0073 / JP | 03 /
UTSUNOMIYA, Motoyasu c/o NEC Display Solutions Ltd. 4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0073 / JP | 04 /
OSAKA, Akihiro c/o NEC Display Solutions Ltd. 4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0073 / JP | 05 /
MATSUBARA, Masateru c/o NEC Display Solutions Ltd. 4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0073 / JP | [2012/49] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2017/17] |
Former [2012/49] | Betten & Resch Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10844602.2 | 29.01.2010 | [2017/17] | WO2010JP51237 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011092841 | Date: | 04.08.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2530520 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2530520 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.08.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G03B21/00, G03B21/14, G03B21/20, G02B5/22, G02B26/00, G02B27/09, G02B27/14, G03B33/08, G03B33/12, H04N5/04, H04N9/31 | [2016/28] | CPC: |
G02B26/008 (EP,US);
H04N9/3155 (US);
G02B5/22 (EP,US);
G03B21/2013 (EP,US);
G03B21/2033 (EP,US);
G03B21/204 (EP,US);
G03B33/08 (EP,US);
G03B33/12 (EP,US);
H04N5/04 (US);
H04N9/3111 (EP,US);
H04N9/3161 (EP,US);
H04N9/3197 (US);
|
Former IPC [2012/49] | G03B21/00, G03B21/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHES BELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEM UND PROJEKTOR DAMIT | [2012/49] | English: | ILLUMINATION OPTICAL SYSTEM AND PROJECTOR USING SAME | [2012/49] | French: | SYSTÈME OPTIQUE D'ÉCLAIRAGE ET PROJECTEUR UTILISANT CELUI-CI | [2012/49] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2012 | Translation filed | 29.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/49] | 14.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16199826.5 / EP3168684 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.01.2010 | AT | 26.04.2017 | CY | 26.04.2017 | CZ | 26.04.2017 | DK | 26.04.2017 | EE | 26.04.2017 | ES | 26.04.2017 | FI | 26.04.2017 | HR | 26.04.2017 | IT | 26.04.2017 | LT | 26.04.2017 | LV | 26.04.2017 | MC | 26.04.2017 | MK | 26.04.2017 | NL | 26.04.2017 | PL | 26.04.2017 | PT | 26.04.2017 | RO | 26.04.2017 | SE | 26.04.2017 | SI | 26.04.2017 | SK | 26.04.2017 | SM | 26.04.2017 | TR | 26.04.2017 | BG | 26.07.2017 | NO | 26.07.2017 | GR | 27.07.2017 | IS | 26.08.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 29.01.2010 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PT | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 26.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009262308 (OGAWA MASAHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0068]; figure 4 *; | [E]US2010328626 (MIYAZAKI TAKESHI [JP]) [E] 1-5 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0035]; figure 2 *; | [E]US2010328633 (SATO MAKOTO [JP], et al) [E] 1-5* paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0085]; figures 8-9 *; | [E]EP2270589 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-5 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0107]; figures 5-10 * | International search | [A]JP2004341105 (NEC VIEWTECHNOLOGY LTD); | [A]JP2008052070 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [A]JP2009266463 (PANASONIC CORP) | by applicant | JP2003186110 |