EP2531351 - RELEASE SHEET, SYNTHETIC LEATHER AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2016 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LINTEC Corporation 23-23 Hon-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 173-0001 / JP | [2012/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGIMOTO, Hideki c/o LINTEC Corporation 23-23 Honcho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 173-0001 / JP | 02 /
SASAKI, Daisuke c/o LINTEC Corporation 23-23 Honcho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 173-0001 / JP | 03 /
TAKAOKA, Kenji c/o LINTEC Corporation 23-23 Honcho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 173-0001 / JP | [2012/50] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/50] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10845015.6 | 02.02.2010 | WO2010CN70478 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011094930 | Date: | 11.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2531351 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.08.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/08, B32B38/06, D06N3/00, // D21H27/02 | [2016/11] | CPC: |
B32B38/06 (EP,KR);
B32B27/06 (KR);
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/10 (EP);
B32B27/304 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B27/40 (EP);
B32B29/002 (EP);
B32B3/28 (EP);
B32B3/30 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP);
D06N3/00 (KR);
D06N3/0097 (EP);
D21H27/001 (EP);
B32B2255/12 (EP);
B32B2260/028 (EP);
B32B2260/046 (EP);
B32B2270/00 (EP);
B32B2307/306 (EP);
B32B2307/408 (EP);
B32B2307/538 (EP);
B32B2307/732 (EP);
B32B2307/734 (EP);
B32B2307/748 (EP);
B32B2309/02 (EP);
B32B2309/10 (EP);
B32B2309/105 (EP);
B32B2317/08 (EP);
B32B37/153 (EP);
D06N2209/1664 (EP);
D06N2211/28 (EP);
D21H19/22 (EP);
D21H27/02 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/50] | B32B27/06, B32B38/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/50] | Title | German: | ABZIEHFOLIE, KUNSTLEDER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2012/50] | English: | RELEASE SHEET, SYNTHETIC LEATHER AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF | [2012/50] | French: | FEUILLE ANTI-ADHÉRENTE, CUIR SYNTHÉTIQUE ET LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2012/50] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 24.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/02] | 24.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2009044865 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0023] * * figures 2(a),5-8 * * paragraph [0001] * [A] 5; | [XA]US6733864 (KUBOTA TAKESHI [JP]) [X] 1-4,6 * column 4, line 20 - line 29 * * column 6, line 27 - line 31 * * column 17, line 9 - line 12 * * figures 1,18B * [A] 5 | International search | [A]JP2007296672 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]WO2006006713 (LINTEC CORP [JP], et al); | [A]WO2007091593 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2007072696 (LINTEC CORP [JP], et al); | [A]WO2005065937 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]US2004062913 (SUTO KENICHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]CN1827350 (FORHOUSE CORP [CN]); | [A]CN1746421 (JIN AICHEN [CN]) |