EP2535666 - REFRIGERATION CYCLE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2020/30] |
Former [2012/51] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMASHITA, Koji c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
MORIMOTO, Hiroyuki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
HATOMURA, Takeshi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2012/51] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2020/30] |
Former [2012/51] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10845673.2 | 10.02.2010 | [2020/30] | WO2010JP00838 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011099067 | Date: | 18.08.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2535666 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2535666 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.08.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F25B1/00, F25B29/00, F25B41/00, F25B13/00, F25B9/00, F25B25/00 | [2017/27] | CPC: |
F25B13/00 (EP,US);
F25B41/42 (EP,US);
F25B2309/061 (EP,US);
F25B2313/006 (EP,US);
F25B2313/023 (EP,US);
F25B2313/0231 (EP,US);
F25B2313/0253 (EP,US);
F25B2313/0272 (EP,US);
F25B2313/02732 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/51] | F25B1/00, F25B29/00, F25B41/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÄLTEKREISLAUFVORRICHTUNG | [2012/51] | English: | REFRIGERATION CYCLE DEVICE | [2012/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF A CYCLE FRIGORIFIQUE | [2012/51] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2012 | Translation filed | 01.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 01.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/51] | 18.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.01.2020 | 30.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2018 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.02.2010 | AT | 22.07.2020 | CY | 22.07.2020 | CZ | 22.07.2020 | DK | 22.07.2020 | EE | 22.07.2020 | ES | 22.07.2020 | FI | 22.07.2020 | HR | 22.07.2020 | IT | 22.07.2020 | LT | 22.07.2020 | LV | 22.07.2020 | MC | 22.07.2020 | MK | 22.07.2020 | MT | 22.07.2020 | NL | 22.07.2020 | PL | 22.07.2020 | RO | 22.07.2020 | SE | 22.07.2020 | SI | 22.07.2020 | SK | 22.07.2020 | SM | 22.07.2020 | TR | 22.07.2020 | BG | 22.10.2020 | NO | 22.10.2020 | GR | 23.10.2020 | IS | 22.11.2020 | PT | 23.11.2020 | IE | 10.02.2021 | LU | 10.02.2021 | BE | 28.02.2021 | CH | 28.02.2021 | FR | 28.02.2021 | LI | 28.02.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 10.02.2010 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CY | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
MK | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
TR | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
IE | 10.02.2021 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 10.02.2010 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CY | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
MK | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
IE | 10.02.2021 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 10.02.2010 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CY | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
IE | 10.02.2021 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
CY | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
IE | 10.02.2021 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
IE | 10.02.2021 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
IE | 10.02.2021 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 22.07.2020 | |
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 22.07.2020 | |
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2003139420 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [X] 1-3,13 * & corresponding description;; figures 1,3 * [I] 4-6; | [XA]EP2136158 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8,13 * the whole document * [A] 9-12; | [Y]WO2009133644 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 9-12 * & corresponding description;; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2006137386 (ITSUKI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 9-12 * paragraph [0031] * | International search | [Y]JP2005337524 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [Y]JPH09101070 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [Y]JP2008241086 (HITACHI APPLIANCES INC); | [Y]JP2008122059 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [Y]JPH10318628 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JPS60114662 (TOSHIBA KK) | Examination | US2007113582 | JPH09101070 | JPS60114662 | WO2009133640 | by applicant | JP2005140444 | JPH05280818 | JP2001289465 | JP2003343936 |