EP2534275 - CUTTING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TaeguTec Ltd. 304, Yonggye-ri Gachang-myeon Dalseong-gun Daegu 711-865 / KR | [2012/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUN, Chol Woen C/O TaeguTec Ltd. 304 Yonggye-ri Gachang-myeon Dalseong-gun, Daegu 711-865 / KR | 02 /
JEONG, Yong Hyun c/o TaeguTec Ltd. 304 Yonggye-ri Gachang-myeon Dalseong-gun, Daegu 711-865 / KR | 03 /
YOON, Moo Young c/o TaeguTec Ltd. 304 Yonggye-ri Gachang-myeon Dalseong-gun, Daegu 711-865 / KR | [2016/35] |
Former [2012/51] | 01 /
YUN, Chol Woen C/O TaeguTec Ltd. 304 Yonggye-ri Gachang-myeon Dalseong-gun Daegu 711-865 / KR | ||
02 /
JEONG, Yong Hyun c/o TaeguTec Ltd. 304 Yonggye-ri Gachang-myeon Dalseong-gun Daegu 711-865 / KR | |||
03 /
YOON, Moo Young c/o TaeguTec Ltd. 304 Yonggye-ri Gachang-myeon Dalseong-gun Daegu 711-865 / KR | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/35] |
Former [2012/51] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10845853.0 | 26.08.2010 | [2016/35] | WO2010KR05735 | Priority number, date | KR20100012965 | 11.02.2010 Original published format: KR 20100012965 | [2012/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011099683 | Date: | 18.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2534275 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2534275 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.08.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/06, C23C14/16, B23B27/14, C23C28/00, C23C28/04 | [2014/08] | CPC: |
C23C30/005 (EP,US);
C23C28/044 (EP,US);
C23C28/048 (EP,US);
C23C28/40 (EP,US);
C23C28/42 (EP,US);
C23C28/44 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12632 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12743 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/51] | C23C14/06, C23C14/16, B23B27/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNEIDWERKZEUG | [2016/12] | English: | CUTTING TOOL | [2012/51] | French: | OUTIL DE COUPE | [2012/51] |
Former [2012/51] | SCHNEIDEWERKZEUG | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/51] | 18.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.08.2010 | AL | 31.08.2016 | AT | 31.08.2016 | BE | 31.08.2016 | CY | 31.08.2016 | CZ | 31.08.2016 | DK | 31.08.2016 | EE | 31.08.2016 | ES | 31.08.2016 | FI | 31.08.2016 | HR | 31.08.2016 | IT | 31.08.2016 | LT | 31.08.2016 | LV | 31.08.2016 | MC | 31.08.2016 | MK | 31.08.2016 | NL | 31.08.2016 | PL | 31.08.2016 | RO | 31.08.2016 | SE | 31.08.2016 | SI | 31.08.2016 | SK | 31.08.2016 | SM | 31.08.2016 | TR | 31.08.2016 | BG | 30.11.2016 | NO | 30.11.2016 | GR | 01.12.2016 | IS | 31.12.2016 | PT | 02.01.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 26.08.2010 | |
AL | 31.08.2016 | ||
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MK | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
TR | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 26.08.2010 | |
AL | 31.08.2016 | ||
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MK | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 26.08.2010 | |
AL | 31.08.2016 | ||
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 26.08.2010 | |
AL | 31.08.2016 | ||
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 31.08.2016 | |
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 31.08.2016 | |
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 31.08.2016 | |
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 31.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2007141346 (NORDLOF KJELL [SE], et al) [I] 1-4 * paragraphs [0017] - [0018]; claim 1 *; | [A] - PALDEY S ET AL, "Single layer and multilayer wear resistant coatings of (Ti,Al)N: a review", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING A: STRUCTURAL MATERIALS:PROPERTIES, MICROSTRUCTURE & PROCESSING, LAUSANNE, CH, (20020524), vol. A342, doi:10.1016/S0921-5093(02)00259-9, ISSN 0921-5093, pages 58 - 79, XP002681141 [A] 1-4 * figure 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0921-5093(02)00259-9 | International search | [A]KR100900529B (KORLOY INC [KR]); | [A]JPH06316756 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO); | [A]JPH1161380 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [A]KR20040094673 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS KOBE TOOLS CO. ET AL.); | [A]KR100876366B (KORLOY INC [KR]) | by applicant | US2007141346 |