EP2543331 - PROSTHESIS FOR DENTAL IMPLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Internacional Dental 2007, SL Calle Juan de la Cierva 66 Polígono Industrial Valdearenal Norte 28939 Arroyomolinos (Madrid) 28939 Madrid / ES | [2013/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALVAREZ GARCÍA, José Calle Mar del Norte 59 Majadahonda E-28220 Madrid / ES | 02 /
CABANAS, George Ernest Calle Mar del Norte 59 Majadahonda SP- INJA E-28220 Madrid / ES | [2013/02] | Representative(s) | Urizar Anasagasti, Jesus Maria C/ Segre 27- 1° 28002 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2013/02] | Urizar Anasagasti, Jesus Maria Paseo de la Castellane 72- 1° 28046 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 10846914.9 | 05.03.2010 | WO2010ES70124 | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011107627 | Date: | 09.09.2011 | Language: | ES | [2011/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2543331 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 09.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61C1/08, A61C8/00, A61C13/225 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
A61C13/225 (EP,US);
A61C8/0095 (US);
A61C1/084 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/02] | A61C8/00, A61C13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/02] | Title | German: | PROTHESE FÜR ZAHNIMPLANTATE | [2013/02] | English: | PROSTHESIS FOR DENTAL IMPLANTS | [2013/02] | French: | PROTHÈSE POUR IMPLANTS DENTAIRES | [2013/02] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2012 | Translation filed | 21.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 21.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 21.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/46] | 09.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0622053 (MEDEVELOP AB [SE]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 45 - page 5, line 55; figures 1-8 *; | [X]WO03003933 (DE CLERCK RENE [BE]) [X] 1 * page 4, line 18 - page 9, line 8; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP2103276 (NOBEL BIOCARE SERVICES AG [CH]) [A] 1* paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0162]; figures 1-15 * | International search | [A]US2002192620 (JORNEUS LARS [SE], et al); | [A]ES2201906 (TOBOSO RAMON JESUS [ES]); | [X]ES2206763T (TECH D USINAGE SINLAB INC) |