EP2462858 - MEDICAL SYSTEM AND CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2015/44] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2012/49] | For all designated states OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2012/24] | For all designated states Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UMEMOTO, Yoshitaka OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Kazuhiko OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/44] |
Former [2012/24] | 01 /
UMEMOTO Yoshitaka c/o OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKAHASHI Kazuhiko c/o OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10847057.6 | 29.11.2010 | WO2010JP71243 | Priority number, date | JP20100045602 | 02.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010045602 | [2012/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011108161 | Date: | 09.09.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2462858 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B1/005, A61B1/008, // G02B23/24 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
A61B1/008 (EP,US);
A61B1/0016 (EP,US);
A61B1/0057 (EP,US);
A61B1/009 (EP);
A61B1/0052 (EP,US);
G02B23/2476 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/24] | A61B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/24] | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHES SYSTEM UND STEUERVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2012/24] | English: | MEDICAL SYSTEM AND CONTROL METHOD | [2012/24] | French: | SYSTÈME MÉDICAL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2012/24] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2012 | Translation filed | 08.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/24] | 24.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/32] | 14.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009253959 (YOSHIE MICHIFUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8,9,11,12,15,16,18,20-23 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 12] , [0030] , [0 39] , [0040] , [0042] * * paragraphs [0046] , [0 47] , [0048] , [0052] - paragraph [0061] * * figure 1 *; | [X]US2004138530 (KAWAI TOSHIMASA [JP], et al) [X] 1-16,18,20-23 * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0078] * * figure 1 *; | [X]US2005168571 (LIA RAYMOND A [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraphs [0039] , [0042] * * figures 1A,5 * | International search | [A]JP2007054307 (OLYMPUS CORP); | [A]JP2000300511 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [A]JP2007283115 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [A]JP2004041538 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [A]JPH0622904 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [A]JP2007319622 (OLYMPUS CORP); | [A]JP2002323661 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) | by applicant | JP2000300511 | JP2007283115 | JP2010045602 |