EP2548387 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR EMERGENCY CALL HANDLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2013/04] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YLI-TUOMI, Ilkka Emäpuuntie 74C FIN-90500 Oulu / FI | 02 /
KOSKELA, Jarkko Kajuuttapiha 3 FIN-90500 Oulu / FI | 03 /
LAITINEN, Pasi Kaijalankuja 2 FIN-90460 Oulusalo / FI | 04 /
KINNUNEN, Juha Sauvojantie 1 G FIN-90560 Oulu / FI | [2013/04] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2013/04] | Jaatinen, Jussi Imari Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 10847775.3 | 19.03.2010 | WO2010IB51212 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011114193 | Date: | 22.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2548387 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 22.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/22, H04M11/04, H04M1/725 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
H04L12/6418 (EP,US);
H04W4/90 (EP,US);
H04W76/50 (EP,US);
H04W48/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HANDHABUNG VON NOTRUFEN | [2013/04] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR EMERGENCY CALL HANDLING | [2013/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DES APPELS D'URGENCE | [2013/04] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/04] | 03.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/09] | 25.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005090224 (DORSEY DONALD A [US], et al); | [A]US2008102784 (MITTAL VINEET [US], et al); | [A]WO2008148213 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA], et al); | [A]CN101521867 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [A]US2010029274 (DESHPANDE MANOJ M [US], et al) |