EP2549527 - DEPOSITION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPP Technologies Co., Ltd. Keidanren Kaikan 15F, 1-3-2, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 1000-0004 / JP | [2013/35] |
Former [2013/04] | For all designated states SPP Technologies Co., Ltd. Office Tower Y 8F 8-11 Harumi 1-Chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-6108 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HATASHITA, Masayasu c/o SUMITOMO PRECISION PRODUCTS CO. LTD. 1-10 Fuso-cho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0891 / JP | 02 /
OISHI, Akimitsu c/o SUMITOMO PRECISION PRODUCTS CO. LTD. 1-10 Fuso-cho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0891 / JP | 03 /
MURAKAMI, Shoichi c/o SUMITOMO PRECISION PRODUCTS CO. LTD. 1-10 Fuso-cho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0891 / JP | [2013/04] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/04] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10847987.4 | 25.11.2010 | WO2010JP70971 | Priority number, date | JP20100060091 | 17.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010060091 | [2013/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011114581 | Date: | 22.09.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2549527 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2549527 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/455, C23C16/509, H01L27/146, C23C16/04, C23C16/40, H01L21/316 | [2015/13] | CPC: |
H01L21/02164 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02274 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/045 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/401 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/45523 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/022 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02211 (KR);
H01L27/14683 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/39] | H01L21/316, C23C16/42, C23C16/509, H01L27/146, H01L21/02, C23C16/04, C23C16/40 | ||
Former IPC [2013/04] | H01L21/316, C23C16/42, C23C16/509 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABSCHEIDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2013/04] | English: | DEPOSITION METHOD | [2013/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION DE FILM | [2013/04] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2012 | Translation filed | 04.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2012 | Examination requested [2013/04] | 10.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.11.2010 | AL | 24.06.2015 | AT | 24.06.2015 | BE | 24.06.2015 | CY | 24.06.2015 | CZ | 24.06.2015 | DK | 24.06.2015 | EE | 24.06.2015 | ES | 24.06.2015 | FI | 24.06.2015 | HR | 24.06.2015 | IT | 24.06.2015 | LT | 24.06.2015 | LV | 24.06.2015 | MC | 24.06.2015 | MK | 24.06.2015 | MT | 24.06.2015 | NL | 24.06.2015 | PL | 24.06.2015 | RO | 24.06.2015 | RS | 24.06.2015 | SE | 24.06.2015 | SI | 24.06.2015 | SK | 24.06.2015 | SM | 24.06.2015 | TR | 24.06.2015 | BG | 24.09.2015 | NO | 24.09.2015 | GR | 25.09.2015 | IS | 24.10.2015 | PT | 26.10.2015 | IE | 25.11.2015 | LU | 25.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 25.11.2010 | |
AT | 24.06.2015 | ||
BE | 24.06.2015 | ||
CY | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
MK | 24.06.2015 | ||
MT | 24.06.2015 | ||
NL | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SE | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
SM | 24.06.2015 | ||
TR | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
IE | 25.11.2015 | ||
LU | 25.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 25.11.2010 | |
AT | 24.06.2015 | ||
BE | 24.06.2015 | ||
CY | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
MT | 24.06.2015 | ||
NL | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SE | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
SM | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
IE | 25.11.2015 | ||
LU | 25.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
BE | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
IE | 25.11.2015 | ||
LU | 25.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
IE | 25.11.2015 | ||
LU | 25.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
LU | 25.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
LU | 25.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
LU | 25.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 24.06.2015 | |
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 24.06.2015 | |
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 24.06.2015 | |
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 24.06.2015 | |
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004115898 (MOGHADAM FARHAD K [US], et al) [A] 1-3* paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0026] - [0042] *; | [XA]US2008166888 (HSU SHAO-TA [TW], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [0012] - [0015] - [0 20] - [0023] - [0025] - [0030]; figures 4,5,7-10 * [A] 2,3 | International search | [A]JP2000150646 (SONY CORP); | [A]JP2008244490 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2009004397 (NEC ELECTRONICS CORP) | by applicant | JP2009158862 |