EP2553815 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REDUCING RECONFIGURATION POWER USAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.2016 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Altera Corporation 101 Innovation Drive San Jose, CA 95134-1941 / US | [2015/37] |
Former [2015/30] | For all designated states Tabula (Assignment for the Benefit of Creditors), LLC 3250 Olcott Street Santa Clara CA 95054 / US | ||
Former [2013/06] | For all designated states Tabula, Inc. 3250 Olcott St. Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Randy, R. 1867 Shafer Avenue Morgan Hill CA 95037 / US | 02 /
VOOGEL, Martin 1634 Dallas Court Los Altos CA 94024 / US | 03 /
HU, Jingcao 1076 Reed Avenue Apartment 74 Sunnyvale CA 94086 / US | 04 /
TEIG, Steven 935 College Avenue Menlo Park CA 94025 / US | [2013/06] | Representative(s) | Hermann, Felix, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/06] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10849164.8 | 21.10.2010 | WO2010US53487 | Priority number, date | US20100321128P | 05.04.2010 Original published format: US 321128 P | US20100323352P | 12.04.2010 Original published format: US 323352 P | US20100321498P | 06.04.2010 Original published format: US 321498 P | US20100355546P | 16.06.2010 Original published format: US 355546 P | US20100320697P | 02.04.2010 Original published format: US 320697 P | [2013/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011123151 | Date: | 06.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2553815 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/173 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
H03K19/0008 (EP,US);
G06F30/00 (US);
G06F30/34 (EP,US);
G06F30/343 (US);
G06F30/394 (EP,US);
G06F30/398 (US);
H03K19/1737 (EP,US);
H03K19/17748 (EP,US);
H03K19/17756 (EP,US);
H03K19/17784 (EP,US);
H03K19/17796 (EP,US);
G06F2119/06 (EP,US);
G06F30/392 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR REDUZIERUNG DER NUTZUNG VON NEUKONFIGURATIONSENERGIE | [2013/06] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REDUCING RECONFIGURATION POWER USAGE | [2013/06] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉDUCTION DE LA CONSOMMATION D'ÉNERGIE LORS D'UNE RECONFIGURATION | [2013/06] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2012 | Search fee paid | 16.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/06] | 03.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/45] | 20.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5721703 (HABERSETZER DARYL L [US], et al); | [Y]US2008061834 (TETSUKAWA TATSUYA [JP], et al); | [X]US2008272801 (HUTCHINGS BRAD [US], et al); | [X]US2009037862 (ROHE ANDRE [US], et al); | [A]US7656188 (TEIG STEVEN [US], et al) |