EP2521324 - METHOD FOR REDUCING FAILURE OF CONFIGURATION UPDATE INITIATED BY EVOLVED NODE B (ENB) AND CORRESPONDING ENB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/45] | METHOD FOR REDUCING FAILURE OF CONFIGURATION UPDATE INITIATED BY eNB AND eNB | ||
[2018/46] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Yi ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2012/45] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 10852037.0 | 23.11.2010 | WO2010CN79013 | Priority number, date | CN201010182732 | 25.05.2010 Original published format: CN201010182732 | [2012/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011147168 | Date: | 01.12.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2521324 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, // H04W24/04, H04W88/08 | [2017/02] | CPC: |
H04L41/082 (EP,US);
H04L41/0681 (EP,US);
H04W24/04 (EP,US);
H04W88/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/45] | H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MINIMIERUNG VON FEHLERN BEI ENB-INITIIERTEN KONFIGURATIONSAKTUALISIERUNGEN UND ENTSPRECHENDER EVOLVED NODE B (ENB) | [2018/46] | English: | METHOD FOR REDUCING FAILURE OF CONFIGURATION UPDATE INITIATED BY EVOLVED NODE B (ENB) AND CORRESPONDING ENB | [2018/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉDUCTION DE DÉFAILLANCE D'UNE MISE À JOUR DE CONFIGURATION INITIÉE PAR UN NOEUD ÉVOLUÉ (ENB) ET ENB CORRESPONDANT | [2018/46] |
Former [2012/45] | VERFAHREN ZUR MINIMIERUNG VON FEHLERN BEI ENB-INITIIERTEN KONFIGURATIONSAKTUALISIERUNGEN UND ENB | ||
Former [2012/45] | METHOD FOR REDUCING FAILURE OF CONFIGURATION UPDATE INITIATED BY eNB AND eNB | ||
Former [2012/45] | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉDUCTION DE DÉFAILLANCE D'UNE MISE À JOUR DE CONFIGURATION INITIÉE PAR UN N UD B ÉVOLUÉ (ENB) ET ENB | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2012 | Translation filed | 31.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 31.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/45] | 19.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/35] | 11.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9917203 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 7, line 16 - page 8, line 18 * * page 10, line 11 - page 11, line 38 * | [A] - 3GPP, "3rd Generation Partnership Project;Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network;Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access Network (E-UTRAN); S1 Application Protocol (S1AP)(Release 8)", 3GPP DRAFT; 36413-860, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090612), no. San Francisco; 20090612, XP050341840 [A] 1-10 * page 48 - page 49 * | International search | [A]CN101198115 (BEIJING SAMSUNG COMM TECH RES [CN]); | [A]CN101272614 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN101415176 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) |