EP2577094 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT IN ARRANGING AN ALUMINIUM FERRULE TO A HIGH STRENGTH EVE OF A STEEL WIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Talurit AB Amalia Jönssons gata 29 421 31 Västra Frölunda / SE | [2020/21] |
Former [2013/15] | For all designated states Talurit AB Amalia Jönssons gata 29 421 31 Västra Frölunda / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROHLAND, Bernhard Lilla Bergsbogatan 1 S-431 38 Mölndal / SE | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/21] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2014/25] | Cederbom, Hans Erik August, et al Cegumark AB Box 53047 400 14 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2013/15] | Bergentall, Annika Maria Cegumark AB Kungsportsavenyn 10 400 14 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 10852275.6 | 25.05.2010 | [2020/21] | WO2010SE00142 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011149390 | Date: | 01.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2577094 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2577094 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 01.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16G11/02, B21F45/14 | [2013/15] | CPC: |
B21F15/06 (EP,US);
A44B13/00 (US);
B21F45/14 (EP,US);
F16G11/02 (EP,US);
Y10T24/38 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3933 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG BEI DER ANORDNUNG EINER ALUMINIUMHÜLSE ÜBER ENE HOCHFESTE ÖSE EINES STRAHLDRAHTES | [2013/15] | English: | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT IN ARRANGING AN ALUMINIUM FERRULE TO A HIGH STRENGTH EVE OF A STEEL WIRE | [2013/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET AGENCEMENT PERMETTANT DE DISPOSER UNE VIROLE EN ALUMINIUM SUR UN ILLET À HAUTE RÉSISTANCE D'UN CÂBLE EN ACIER | [2013/15] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2012 | Search fee paid | 27.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 10.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2018 | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.02.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.05.2010 | AL | 20.05.2020 | AT | 20.05.2020 | CY | 20.05.2020 | CZ | 20.05.2020 | DK | 20.05.2020 | EE | 20.05.2020 | ES | 20.05.2020 | FI | 20.05.2020 | HR | 20.05.2020 | LT | 20.05.2020 | LV | 20.05.2020 | MC | 20.05.2020 | MK | 20.05.2020 | MT | 20.05.2020 | NL | 20.05.2020 | PL | 20.05.2020 | RO | 20.05.2020 | SE | 20.05.2020 | SI | 20.05.2020 | SK | 20.05.2020 | SM | 20.05.2020 | TR | 20.05.2020 | IE | 25.05.2020 | LU | 25.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | CH | 31.05.2020 | LI | 31.05.2020 | FR | 20.07.2020 | BG | 20.08.2020 | NO | 20.08.2020 | GR | 21.08.2020 | IS | 20.09.2020 | PT | 21.09.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 25.05.2010 | |
AL | 20.05.2020 | ||
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CY | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
MT | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
TR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IE | 25.05.2020 | ||
LU | 25.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 20.07.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
TR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IE | 25.05.2020 | ||
LU | 25.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 20.07.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
IE | 25.05.2020 | ||
LU | 25.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 20.07.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
IE | 25.05.2020 | ||
LU | 25.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
LU | 25.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 20.05.2020 | |
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 20.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1074527 (CABLE COBERS LTD) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [A]GB1369211 (BRIDON LTD) [A] 1-6 * page 2, line 75 - line 116; figures 1-5a *; | [X]GB1450936 (BRIDON LTD) [X] 1-6 * page 1, line 75 - line 93 * * page 2, lines 9-14, 77-79; figures 1-7 * | International search | [A]GB896468 (KNUD AAGE FABER, et al); | [A]GB1074527 (CABLE COBERS LTD); | [A]GB1256090 (CESARINI JACQUES FRANCOIS [FR]) |