EP2469610 - CLAMPING UNIT FOR DEPOSITING THIN FILM SOLAR CELL AND SIGNAL FEED-IN METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2015 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Trony Science & Technology Development Co., Ltd. 5/F East 8/F East Bldg. 2 Guangxian Estate Bagua 3rd Road Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518029 / CN | [2012/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Yi Room 534 Xianke Mechanism&Electronic Mansion Bagua 4rd Road Futian District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518029 / CN | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b 82319 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b 82319 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10852663.3 | 21.10.2010 | WO2010CN01654 | Priority number, date | CN201010198736 | 11.06.2010 Original published format: CN201010198736 | [2012/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011153670 | Date: | 15.12.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2469610 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2469610 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/18, C23C16/505, H01J37/04, H01J37/32 | [2013/19] | CPC: |
H01J37/32091 (EP,US);
H01L31/18 (KR);
C23C16/4587 (EP,US);
C23C16/505 (KR);
H01J37/32577 (EP,US);
H01J37/32715 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/26] | H01L31/18, C23C16/505, H01J37/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLEMMEINHEIT ZUR ABLAGERUNG EINER DÜNNSCHICHTSOLARZELLE UND SIGNALEINSPEISUNGSVERFAHREN | [2014/18] | English: | CLAMPING UNIT FOR DEPOSITING THIN FILM SOLAR CELL AND SIGNAL FEED-IN METHOD | [2012/26] | French: | UNITÉ DE FIXATION PERMETTANT DE DÉPOSER UNE CELLULE SOLAIRE EN COUCHES MINCES ET PROCÉDÉ D'INJECTION DE SIGNAL | [2012/26] |
Former [2012/26] | KLEMMVERFAHREN ZUR ABLAGERUNG EINER DÜNNSCHICHTSOLARZELLE UND SIGNALEINSPEISUNGSVERFAHREN | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2012 | Translation filed | 21.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 21.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/26] | 24.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.10.2010 | AL | 15.10.2014 | AT | 15.10.2014 | BG | 15.10.2014 | CY | 15.10.2014 | CZ | 15.10.2014 | DK | 15.10.2014 | EE | 15.10.2014 | ES | 15.10.2014 | FI | 15.10.2014 | HR | 15.10.2014 | IT | 15.10.2014 | LT | 15.10.2014 | LV | 15.10.2014 | MC | 15.10.2014 | MK | 15.10.2014 | MT | 15.10.2014 | NL | 15.10.2014 | PL | 15.10.2014 | RO | 15.10.2014 | RS | 15.10.2014 | SE | 15.10.2014 | SI | 15.10.2014 | SK | 15.10.2014 | SM | 15.10.2014 | TR | 15.10.2014 | IE | 21.10.2014 | LU | 21.10.2014 | BE | 31.10.2014 | CH | 31.10.2014 | LI | 31.10.2014 | NO | 15.01.2015 | GR | 16.01.2015 | IS | 15.02.2015 | PT | 16.02.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 21.10.2010 | |
AT | 15.10.2014 | ||
BG | 15.10.2014 | ||
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
MK | 15.10.2014 | ||
MT | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
SM | 15.10.2014 | ||
TR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 21.10.2014 | ||
LU | 21.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 21.10.2010 | |
AT | 15.10.2014 | ||
BG | 15.10.2014 | ||
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
MT | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
SM | 15.10.2014 | ||
TR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 21.10.2014 | ||
LU | 21.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 21.10.2010 | |
AT | 15.10.2014 | ||
BG | 15.10.2014 | ||
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
SM | 15.10.2014 | ||
TR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 21.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
BG | 15.10.2014 | ||
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
SM | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 21.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
SM | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 21.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 21.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 21.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 15.10.2014 | |
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 15.10.2014 | |
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 15.10.2014 | |
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 15.10.2014 | |
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 15.10.2014 | |
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | NL | 15.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2008019470 (FUJI ELECTRIC HOLDINGS) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figure 10 *; | [A]CN101187014 (UNIV NANKAI [CN]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]CN101187016 (UNIV NANKAI [CN]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2009079265 (FUJI ELECTRIC SYSTEMS CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * abstract ** figures 1-4 *; | [XP]CN101857953 (SHENZHEN TRONY SOLAR CORP) [XP] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [IP]CN101859801 (SHENZHEN TRONY SOLAR CORP) [IP] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [E]US2013063028 (HU SHENGMING [CN], et al) [E] 1-14 * figures 3-6 * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0059] * * claims 1-16 * | International search | [A]US2003150562 (QUON BILL H [US]); | [A]EP1548808 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]); | [A]CN101187016 (UNIV NANKAI [CN]); | [A]CN101187014 (UNIV NANKAI [CN]); | [XP]CN101859801 (SHENZHEN TRONY SOLAR CORP); | [XP]CN101857953 (SHENZHEN TRONY SOLAR CORP) | by applicant | US2003150562 |