Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
09.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
24.11.2017 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
06.08.2017 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
17.03.2017 | Change - classification | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] |
17.03.2017 | Change - classification | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] |
17.03.2017 | Change - date of supplementary search report | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] |
01.07.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.10.2015 | Change - representative | |
23.06.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.04.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.10.2013 | Change - applicant | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] |
11.10.2013 | Change - representative | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] |
23.08.2013 | Change - extension states | published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] |
24.06.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.03.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] |
22.03.2013 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] |
12.02.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.01.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.01.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant | |
10.01.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.12.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication |