EP2583388 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REDUCING INTERFERENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/17] | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks OY Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REDANA, Simone Schlierseestrasse 19 81541 Munchen / DE | 02 /
ZENG, Erlin Rm 1605, Bld A-12, Xisan Qi Jian Hai Dian District Beijing 100096 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Haiming Room 1403, Unit 5, Building 101 Jiang Fu Jia Yuan Jiang Tai Road Chao Yang District Beijing 100015 / CN | 04 /
HAN, Jing Room 5-401, Building 2 Huang Ting Zi Residential Area Hai Dian District Beijing 100088 / CN | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | Borgström, Markus, et al Nokia Solutions and Networks GmbH & Co. KG T&I IPR Patent Administration St.-Martin-Straße 76 80240 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | Borgström, Markus, et al Nokia Solutions and Networks GmbH & Co. KG CEF T&I IPR / Patent Administration 80240 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 10853394.4 | 21.06.2010 | WO2010CN00898 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011160250 | Date: | 29.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2583388 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/155, H04W52/18 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
H04B7/15528 (EP,US);
H04W24/02 (US);
H04B7/15 (US);
H04W52/243 (EP,US);
H04W52/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR INTERFERENZMINDERUNG | [2013/17] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REDUCING INTERFERENCE | [2013/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE RÉDUCTION D'INTERFÉRENCE | [2013/17] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 17.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/15] | 22.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008214182 (WANG SHU-SHAW [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6,9,11-15 * paragraphs [0024] , [0 35] - [0037]; figure 3 * [I] 2,3,5,7,8,10; | [XI]US2009233544 (OYMAN OZGUR [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9,11-15 * paragraphs [0044] , [0049] , [0052] , [0053] , [0055] , [0 57] , [0 61]; figures 4,5,9 *[I] 5,10 | International search | [X]CN101192871 (BEIJING SANSUNG COMM TECHNOLOG [CN]); | [A]CN101192872 (BEIJING SANSUNG COMM TECHNOLOG [CN]); | [A]US2009053994 (SENARATH NIMAL [CA], et al); | [A]US2010124880 (WU XINZHOU [US], et al); | [A] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Consideration on Resource Allocation for Relay Backhaul Link", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 MEETING #56, R1-090790, (20090209), XP050318647 | [A] - RESEARCH IN MOTION, LIMITED, "L2 Relay Interference Mitigation", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 MEETING #55BIS, R1-090026, (20090112), pages 1 - 6, XP050317974 |