EP2523355 - DEVICE AND EQUIPMENT FOR RECEIVING AND TRANSMITTING SIGNALS WITH FOUR-FREQUENCY IN GLOBAL SYSTEM FOR MOBILE COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.10.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2016/49] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | ||
Former [2012/46] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HE, Wenqing ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
YU, Juan ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
GE, Hu ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2012/46] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [2012/46] | Application number, filing date | 10854322.4 | 19.09.2010 | [2016/49] | WO2010CN77091 | Priority number, date | CN201010223521 | 07.07.2010 Original published format: CN201010223521 | [2012/46] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012003663 | Date: | 12.01.2012 | Language: | ZH | [2012/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2523355 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2523355 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.01.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/38 | [2012/46] | CPC: |
H04B1/0053 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND ANLAGE FÜR DEN EMPFANG UND DIE ÜBERTRAGUNG VON SIGNALEN MIT VIERFREQUENZ IN EINEM GLOBALEN SYSTEM FÜR MOBILE KOMMUNIKATION | [2012/46] | English: | DEVICE AND EQUIPMENT FOR RECEIVING AND TRANSMITTING SIGNALS WITH FOUR-FREQUENCY IN GLOBAL SYSTEM FOR MOBILE COMMUNICATION | [2012/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET ÉQUIPEMENT POUR RECEVOIR ET ÉMETTRE DES SIGNAUX À QUATRE FRÉQUENCES DANS UN RÉSEAU MONDIAL DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATION MOBILE | [2012/46] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2012 | Translation filed | 07.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 07.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/46] | 24.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.09.2010 | AL | 07.12.2016 | AT | 07.12.2016 | BE | 07.12.2016 | CY | 07.12.2016 | CZ | 07.12.2016 | DK | 07.12.2016 | EE | 07.12.2016 | ES | 07.12.2016 | FI | 07.12.2016 | HR | 07.12.2016 | IT | 07.12.2016 | LT | 07.12.2016 | LV | 07.12.2016 | MC | 07.12.2016 | MK | 07.12.2016 | NL | 07.12.2016 | PL | 07.12.2016 | RO | 07.12.2016 | SE | 07.12.2016 | SI | 07.12.2016 | SK | 07.12.2016 | SM | 07.12.2016 | TR | 07.12.2016 | BG | 07.03.2017 | NO | 07.03.2017 | GR | 08.03.2017 | IS | 07.04.2017 | PT | 07.04.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 19.09.2010 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
MK | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
TR | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 19.09.2010 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
MK | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 19.09.2010 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.09.2010 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 07.12.2016 | |
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | ES | 07.12.2016 | |
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | ES | 07.12.2016 | |
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 07.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008161038 (LIN I-YUAN [TW], et al) [I] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] , [0024] - [0031] * * figure 1 *; | [I]US2003157912 (ATKINSON SIMON [GB], et al) [I] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0 56] , [0 64] , [0 65] , [0 95] - [0104] * * pages 1, 2, 6 *; | [I]EP1418680 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP]) [I] 1-8 * abstract * * pages 110-116 * * figures 22-24 * | International search | [A]US6690949 (SHAMLOU DANNY [US], et al); | [A]CN201252148Y (SUZHOU RF TOP ELECTRONIC COMM [CN]); | [A]CN201397874Y (NANJING SAIGEW MICROWAVE SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [A]CN101663824 (PALM INC) |