EP2471420 - Capsule brewing unit and capsule coffee machine equipped therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/27] | CAPSULE MAKING MECHANISM AND CAPSULE COFFEE MACHINE PROVIDED WITH THE MAKING MECHANISM | ||
[2017/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Midea Group Co., Ltd. B26-28F, Midea Headquarter Building No. 6 Midea Avenue Beijiao Shunde Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | [2018/08] |
Former [2012/27] | For all designated states Mei De Jituan Ltd. Penglai Road Beijiao Town Shunde District Foshan Guangdong 528311 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIAO, Liming PengLai Road BeiJiao Town ShunDe District FoShan Guangdong 528311 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Zhonghua PengLai Road BeiJiao Town ShunDe District FoShan Guangdong 528311 / CN | 03 /
JIN, Huan PengLai Road BeiJiao Town ShunDe District FoShan Guangdong 528311 / CN | 04 /
TANG, Jiang PengLai Road BeiJiao Town ShunDe District FoShan Guangdong 528311 / CN | [2012/27] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2018/09] |
Former [2012/27] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 10854615.1 | 09.10.2010 | [2018/09] | WO2010CN77611 | Priority number, date | CN201010227466 | 15.07.2010 Original published format: CN201010227466 | [2012/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012006823 | Date: | 19.01.2012 | Language: | ZH | [2012/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2471420 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2471420 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.01.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/40, A47J31/44, A47J31/36 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
A47J31/3633 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kapselbrüheinheit und Kapselkaffeemaschine mit Kapselbrüheinheit | [2017/27] | English: | Capsule brewing unit and capsule coffee machine equipped therewith | [2017/28] | French: | Unité d'infusion de capsule et machine à café à capsule équipée de cette unité d'infusion de capsule | [2017/27] |
Former [2012/27] | KAPSELHERSTELLUNGSMECHANISMUS UND MIT DEM HERSTELLUNGSMECHANISMUS AUSGESTATTETE KAPSELKAFFEEMASCHINE | ||
Former [2012/27] | CAPSULE MAKING MECHANISM AND CAPSULE COFFEE MACHINE PROVIDED WITH THE MAKING MECHANISM | ||
Former [2012/27] | MÉCANISME DE PRÉPARATION DE CAPSULE, ET MACHINE À CAFÉ À CAPSULE ÉQUIPÉE DU MÉCANISME DE PRÉPARATION | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2012 | Translation filed | 26.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/27] | 16.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.09.2017 | 19.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.10.2010 | AL | 28.02.2018 | AT | 28.02.2018 | CY | 28.02.2018 | CZ | 28.02.2018 | DK | 28.02.2018 | EE | 28.02.2018 | ES | 28.02.2018 | FI | 28.02.2018 | HR | 28.02.2018 | LT | 28.02.2018 | LV | 28.02.2018 | MC | 28.02.2018 | MK | 28.02.2018 | PL | 28.02.2018 | PT | 28.02.2018 | RO | 28.02.2018 | RS | 28.02.2018 | SE | 28.02.2018 | SI | 28.02.2018 | SK | 28.02.2018 | SM | 28.02.2018 | TR | 28.02.2018 | BG | 28.05.2018 | NO | 28.05.2018 | GR | 29.05.2018 | IS | 28.06.2018 | IE | 09.10.2018 | LU | 09.10.2018 | MT | 09.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 09.10.2010 | |
AL | 28.02.2018 | ||
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MK | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 09.10.2018 | ||
LU | 09.10.2018 | ||
MT | 09.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 09.10.2010 | |
AL | 28.02.2018 | ||
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 09.10.2018 | ||
LU | 09.10.2018 | ||
MT | 09.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 09.10.2018 | ||
LU | 09.10.2018 | ||
MT | 09.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 09.10.2018 | ||
LU | 09.10.2018 | ||
MT | 09.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 09.10.2018 | ||
LU | 09.10.2018 | ||
MT | 09.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 09.10.2018 | ||
LU | 09.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 09.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 09.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 09.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO2004049878 (NECTA VENDING SOLUTIONS SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1-4,7-10,12 * page 4, line 23 - page 10, line 16; figures 1-5 * [A] 5,6 [I] 11; | [X]EP1046366 (FIANARA INT BV [NL]) [X] 1,2,12 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0020]; figures 1-6 *; | [X]WO2007110842 (CME DI FACCINTI A [IT], et al) [X] 1-3,12 * page 3, line 8 - page 9, line 6; figures 1-6 * | International search | [X]CN1638679 (CIE MEDITERRANEENNE DES CAFES [FR]); | [X]WO2007016977 (DELICA AG [CH], et al); | [X]CN1371650 (SGL ITALIAN S P A [IT]); | [A]CN1819789 (NESTEC SA [CH]); | [A]CN1618383 (WEGGIS STEINER AG [CH]); | [A]EP2044867 (CAPITANI SRL [IT]); | [A]US6079315 (BEAULIEU RODERICK H [US], et al) | by applicant | CN100475108C | CN101500458 |